Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019607

EP1019607 - FRAME PROFILES FOR PRODUCING WINDOW OR DOOR FRAMES AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pazen, Günter
Deutschherrenstrasse 63
54492 Zeltingen-Rachtig / DE
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Müller-Gerbes, Margot
Müller-Gerbes Wagner Albiger
Patentanwälte
Friedrich-Breuer-Strasse 72-78
53225 Bonn / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Müller-Gerbes, Margot, Dipl.-Ing.
Friedrich-Breuer-Strasse 112
53225 Bonn / DE
Application number, filing date98952669.430.09.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998EP06193
Priority number, dateDE199714338130.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19743381
[2000/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9916996
Date:08.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019607
Date:19.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019607
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/26, E06B3/22
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/29]
TitleGerman:RAHMENPROFILE ZUM HERSTELLEN VON RAHMEN FÜR FENSTER ODER TÜREN UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON RAHMENPROFILEN[2000/29]
English:FRAME PROFILES FOR PRODUCING WINDOW OR DOOR FRAMES AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2000/29]
French:PROFILES DE CHASSIS POUR PRODUIRE DES DORMANTS DE FENETRE OU DE PORTE ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES PROFILES DE CHASSIS[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2000National basic fee paid 
28.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
23.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2001Fee for grant paid
22.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT19.12.2001
NL19.12.2001
ES27.06.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2004/04]NL19.12.2001
ES27.06.2002
Former [2003/09]NL19.12.2001
Cited inInternational search[XA]DE9420251U  (ZENKER FENSTER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 13 - page 6; figure - * [A] 9;
 [A]DE3319144  (HELLING WILHELM) [A] 1,2,8,11,16 * page 8, paragraph L - page 10; figure - *;
 [A]US4516356  (DELMAN RALPH [US]) [A] 1,2,8,9,11 * column 2, paragraph L - column 4, line 59; figure - *;
 [A]AT387259B  (INTERNORM FENSTER [AT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]AT387260B  (INTERNORM FENSTER [AT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2156412  (BKL EXTRUSTIONS LIMITED) [A] 1;
 [A]FR2023656  (SCHAERER ANDRE) [A] 3,4,6,12,13 * page 2, line 24 - page 6, line 36; figure - *;
 [A]GB2057037  (TIPPMANN E) [A] 1,8,11-13 * page 2, line 57 - page 4, line 35; figure - *;
 [A]DE3543767  (BUSSMANN RUDOLF, et al) [A] 1,5,11-13,15 * page 14, paragraph L - page 19; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE2316347  (SCHUBERT HEINZ GEORG) [A] 1,6 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]FR1279732  (CT PAL HOLDING A G) [A] 3,4 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9722779  (PAZEN GUENTER [DE])
by applicantDE3707275
 DE4321702
 DE2065935
 EP0373371
 AT387067B
 DE29507482U
 WO9722779
 DE2326425
 DE2326911
 DE2844006
 DE1959464
 DE2752463