blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1045656

EP1045656 - SEAL FOR A DEVICE COMPRISING AN ENVELOPE CONTAINING A FLUID MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/43]SEAL FOR A DEVICE COMPRISING AN ENVELOPE CONTAINING A FLUID MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR MAKING SUCH A DEVICE
[2002/07]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AKI INC.
120 East 56th Street
New York, NY 10022 / US
[2000/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BISHOPP, Derek, Albert
Old Church Chambers 23/24 Sandhill Rd Saint James
Northampton NN5 5LM / GB
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Dummett, Thomas Ian Peter, et al
Dummett Copp, 25 The Square Martlesham Heath, Ipswich
Suffolk IP5 3SL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Dummett, Thomas Ian Peter, et al
Dummett Copp, 25 The Square
Martlesham Heath, Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 3SL / GB
Application number, filing date98952856.709.11.1998
[2000/43]
WO1998GB03313
Priority number, dateGB1997002345107.11.1997         Original published format: GB 9723451
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9923908
Date:20.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1045656
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1045656
Date:29.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.05.1999
ClassificationIPC:A45D40/00
[2000/43]
CPC:
A45D40/0087 (EP); A61L9/18 (EP); B65D75/30 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/43]
TitleGerman:ABDICHTUNG EINES GERÄTES MIT EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT BEINHALTENDE HÜLLE[2002/07]
English:SEAL FOR A DEVICE COMPRISING AN ENVELOPE CONTAINING A FLUID MATERIAL[2002/07]
French:JOINT POUR UN DISPOSITIF COMPOSE D'UNE ENVELOPPE CONTENANT UN MATERIAU LIQUIDE[2002/07]
Former [2000/43]ABDICHTUNG EINES GERÄTES MIT EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT BEINHALTENDE HÜLLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN GERÄTES
Former [2000/43]SEAL FOR A DEVICE COMPRISING AN ENVELOPE CONTAINING A FLUID MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR MAKING SUCH A DEVICE
Former [2000/43]JOINT CON U POUR UN DISPOSITIF COMPOSE D'UNE ENVELOPPE CONTENANT UN MATERIAU LIQUIDE ET PROCEDE SERVANT A FABRIQUER CE DISPOSITIF
Entry into regional phase16.05.2000National basic fee paid 
16.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
16.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2002Fee for grant paid
09.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200104   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.01.2003
BE29.01.2003
CH29.01.2003
FI29.01.2003
GR29.01.2003
IT29.01.2003
LI29.01.2003
NL29.01.2003
DK29.04.2003
PT29.04.2003
SE29.04.2003
DE30.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2004/10]AT29.01.2003
BE29.01.2003
CH29.01.2003
FI29.01.2003
GR29.01.2003
LI29.01.2003
NL29.01.2003
DK29.04.2003
PT29.04.2003
SE29.04.2003
DE30.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/05]AT29.01.2003
CH29.01.2003
FI29.01.2003
GR29.01.2003
LI29.01.2003
NL29.01.2003
DK29.04.2003
PT29.04.2003
SE29.04.2003
DE30.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/04]AT29.01.2003
CH29.01.2003
FI29.01.2003
GR29.01.2003
LI29.01.2003
NL29.01.2003
DK29.04.2003
PT29.04.2003
SE29.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/02]AT29.01.2003
CH29.01.2003
FI29.01.2003
GR29.01.2003
LI29.01.2003
NL29.01.2003
DK29.04.2003
PT29.04.2003
SE29.04.2003
Former [2003/47]AT29.01.2003
CH29.01.2003
FI29.01.2003
GR29.01.2003
LI29.01.2003
NL29.01.2003
PT29.04.2003
SE29.04.2003
Former [2003/46]CH29.01.2003
FI29.01.2003
GR29.01.2003
LI29.01.2003
NL29.01.2003
PT29.04.2003
SE29.04.2003
Former [2003/43]CH29.01.2003
FI29.01.2003
LI29.01.2003
NL29.01.2003
PT29.04.2003
SE29.04.2003
Former [2003/41]CH29.01.2003
FI29.01.2003
LI29.01.2003
NL29.01.2003
SE29.04.2003
Former [2003/40]CH29.01.2003
LI29.01.2003
SE29.04.2003
Former [2003/30]SE29.04.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US4376483  (SULLIVAN WILLIAM E) [A] 1,6,9* figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2284155  (BEAUTIFUL BOUQUET CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,8-10 * page 8 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * abstract *;
 [AD]US5439172  (COMYN JOHN [GB], et al) [AD] 1-3,8-10 * column 5, lines 11-56; figures 1-3 * * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.