Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043324

EP1043324 - PURINE DERIVATIVES AND MEDICINE CONTAINING THE SAME AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION
33-8, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0014 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/21]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0014 / JP
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION
5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TANAKA, Toshihiko Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
Yokohama Research Center 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP
02 / IWASHITA, Eiichirou Mitsubishi Chemical Corporat.
Yokohama Research Center 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP
03 / TARAO, Akiko Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
Yokohama Research Center 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP
04 / AMENOMORI, Akira Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
Yokohama Research Center 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP
05 / ONO, Yuya Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
Yokohama Research Center 1000, Kamoshida-cho
Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-8502 / JP
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98953025.812.11.1998
[2000/41]
WO1998JP05092
Priority number, dateJP1997031036512.11.1997         Original published format: JP 31036597
[2000/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9924432
Date:20.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1043324
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1043324
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.05.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07D473/00, C07D473/06, C07D473/16, C07D473/18, C07D473/28, C07D473/32, C07D473/34, C07D473/40, C07D239/48, C07D239/50, C07D473/20, C07D473/30, C07D473/36, C07D239/42, A61K31/52, A61P11/06
[2001/35]
Former International [2000/41]C07D473/00, C07D473/06, C07D473/16, C07D473/18, C07D473/28, C07D473/32, C07D473/34, C07D473/40, C07D239/48, C07D239/50, A61K31/52, A61K31/535
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/41]
TitleGerman:PURINDERIVATE UND MEDIKAMENTE, WELCHE DIESELBEN ALS AKTIVEN BESTANDTEIL ENTHALTEN[2000/41]
English:PURINE DERIVATIVES AND MEDICINE CONTAINING THE SAME AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT[2000/41]
French:DERIVES DE PURINE ET MEDICAMENT LES RENFERMANT EN TANT QU'INGREDIENT ACTIF[2000/41]
Entry into regional phase07.06.2000Translation filed 
07.06.2000National basic fee paid 
07.06.2000Search fee paid 
07.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
07.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
21.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
27.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2004Fee for grant paid
23.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]US3862189  (SCHWENDER CHARLES F);
 [A]US3936454  (SCHWENDER CHARLES F);
 [A]JPH08231545  (BAYER AG)