Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970965

EP0970965 - CYCLIC PEPTIDES AND MEDICINAL USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAHASHI, Toshiya
20-28-G2, Tsunishi 1-chome
Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-0034 / JP
02 / SAITO, Nobuo
91-1-A202, Sengendai Nishi-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0071 / JP
03 / TAKESHIGE, Hideyuki
20-1, Kamakurayama 3-chome
Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-0031 / JP
04 / TANAKA, Toshiaki
11-24, Numama 1-chome
Zushi-shi Kanagawa 249-0004 / JP
05 / KAINOH, Mie
663-1-201, Fujisawa
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0052 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Coleiro, Raymond , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Coleiro, Raymond , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98953029.012.11.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP05096
Priority number, dateJP1997031169213.11.1997         Original published format: JP 31169297
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9925731
Date:27.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970965
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999
[2000/02]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP0970965
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.05.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07K7/64, A61K38/12
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ZYKLISCHE PEPTIDE UND MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG DAVON[2000/02]
English:CYCLIC PEPTIDES AND MEDICINAL USE THEREOF[2000/02]
French:PEPTIDES CYCLIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION MEDICINALE[2000/02]
MiscellaneousEPB 2000/16: A request for correction of the description and claims was filed under Rule 88 EPC. The applicant has subsequently filed a sequence listing and declared that it includes no new matter.
Entry into regional phase13.08.1999Translation filed 
12.08.1999National basic fee paid 
12.08.1999Search fee paid 
12.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
06.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/13]
22.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]WO9601644  (ATHENA NEUROSCIENCES INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO9600581  (TEXAS BIOTECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al)
Examination   - WANG ET AL. PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI vol. 92, 1995, USA, pages 5714 - 5718