EP1061932 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING EXTRACTS OF CERVUS NIPPON ANTLERS HAVING GROWTH-STIMULATING ACTIVITIES OF HEMATOPOIETIC STEM CELLS AND MEGAKARYOCYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jhon, Gil Ja Ewha Women's University, Department of Chemistry, 11-1, Daehyun-dong, Seodaemoon-ku Seoul / KR | For all designated states Han, So Yeop Ewha Women's University, Department of Chemistry, 11-1, Daehyun-dong, Seodaemoon-ku Seoul / KR | For all designated states Kim, Sang Hee Shinhyundai Villa No. 1-302,42, Garakbon-dong, Songpa-ku Seoul / KR | [2006/04] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Jhon, Gil Ja Ewha Women's University, Department of Chemistry, 11-1, Daehyun-dong, Seodaemoon-ku Seoul / KR | ||
For all designated states Han, So Yeop Ewha Women's University, Department of Chemistry, 11-1, Daehyun-dong, Seodaemoon-ku Seoul / KR | |||
For all designated states Kim, Sang Hee Shinyhyundai Villa No. 1-302,42, Garakbon-dong, Songpa-ku Seoul / KR | |||
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Jhon, Gil Ja Ewha Women's University, Department of Chemistry, 11-1, Daehyun-dong, Seodaemoon-ku Seoul / KR | ||
For all designated states Yang, Hyun Ok Seoul Joongang Hospital, Asan Institute of Life Science, 388-1, Poongnap-dong, Songpa-ku Seoul / KR | |||
For all designated states Kim, Yang Mi Kunkook University, Department of Chemistry, Mojin-dong, Kwangjin-ku Seoul / KR | |||
For all designated states Kim, Sang Hee Shinyhyundai Villa No. 1-302,42, Garakbon-dong, Songpa-ku Seoul / KR | |||
For all designated states Shu, Gi Young Ewha Women's University, Department of Chemistry, Institute of Biotechnology, 11-1, Daehyun-dong, Seodaemoon-ku Seoul / KR | |||
For all designated states Han, So Yeop Ewha Women's University, Department of Chemistry, 11-1, Daehyun-dong, Seodaemoon-ku Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jhon, Gil Ja Ewha Women's University, Dept. of Chemistry, 11-1 Daehyun-dong, Seodaemoon-ku, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Yang, Hyun Ok Seoul Joongang Hospital,Asan Inst. of Life Science 388-1, Poongnap-dong, Songpa-ku, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Kim, Yang Mi Kunkook University, Dept. of Chemistry Mojin-dong, Kwangjin-ku, Seoul / KR | 04 /
Kim, Sang Hee Shinhyundai Villa #1-302, 42 Garakbon-dong Songpa-ku, Seoul / KR | 05 /
Shu, Gi Young Ewha Women's University,Dept. of Chemistry 11-1, Daehyun-dong, Seodaemoon-ku, Seoul / KR | 06 /
Han, So Yeop Ewha Women's University, Dept. of Chemistry 11-1, Daehyun-dong, Seodaemoon-ku, Seoul / KR | [2001/19] |
Former [2001/03] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | |||
03 /
* * * | |||
04 /
* * * | |||
05 /
* * * | |||
06 /
* * * | |||
Former [2000/52] | 01 /
JHON, Gil Ja Dept. of Chemistry 11-1, Daehyun-dong, Seodaemoon-ku Seoul 120-170 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Sang Hee Shinhyundai Villa 1-302, 42, Garakbon-dong Songpa-ku, Seoul 138-169 / KR | |||
03 /
YANG, Hyun Ok Asan Institute of Life Science, 388-1, Poongnap-dong Songpa-ku, Seoul 138-040 / KR | |||
04 /
SUH, Gi Young Ewha Women's Uni., Dept.of Chemistry Inst. of Biochemistry, 11-1, Daehyun-dong ehyun-dSeodaemoon-ku, Seoul 120-170 / KR | |||
05 /
KIM, Yang, Mi Kunkook University, Dept. of Chemistry, Mojin-dong Kwangjin-ku, Seoul 143-701 / KR | |||
06 /
HAN, So Yeop, Ewha Women's University Dept. of Chemistry, 11-1, Daehyun-dong Seodaemoon-ku, Seoul 120-170 / KR | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/52] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr. rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Bardehle, Pagenberg & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98953095.1 | 19.11.1998 | [2000/52] | WO1998KR00368 | Priority number, date | KR19970061346 | 20.11.1997 Original published format: KR 9761346 | KR19980002073 | 17.01.1998 Original published format: KR 9802073 | KR19980030819 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: KR 9830819 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9926640 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1061932 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1061932 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/32, C07C69/587, C07C67/00 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
A61K35/32 (EP);
C07C69/533 (EP);
C07C69/587 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND GEWEIHEXTRAKTE VON CERVUS NIPPON MIT WACHSTUMSSTIMULIERENDER AKTIVITÄT AUF HEMATOPOIETISCHE STAMMZELLEN UND MEGAKARYOZYTEN | [2000/52] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING EXTRACTS OF CERVUS NIPPON ANTLERS HAVING GROWTH-STIMULATING ACTIVITIES OF HEMATOPOIETIC STEM CELLS AND MEGAKARYOCYTES | [2000/52] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE CONTENANT DES EXTRAITS DE BOIS DE CERVUS NIPPON POSSEDANT UNE ACTIVITE DE STIMULATION DE LA CROISSANCE DES CELLULES SOUCHES HEMATOPOIETIQUES ET DES MEGACARYOCYTES | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 25.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 26.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.07.2000 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2000 | 28.07.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2000 | 28.07.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2000 | 28.07.2000 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2000 | 28.07.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2000 | 28.07.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2000 | 28.07.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2000 | 28.07.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2000 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.07.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 25.01.2006 | FR | 25.01.2006 | IT | 25.01.2006 | SE | 25.04.2006 | ES | 06.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/16] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
IT | 25.01.2006 | ||
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
SE | 25.04.2006 | ||
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 25.01.2006 | |
ES | 06.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 06.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0352818 ; | [A]JPH09249576 ; | [A]CN1104897 ; | [A]JPH109912 | [A] - DATABASE WPI ON EPOQUE, Week 9116, LONDON: DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., AN 91-112630; & JP 3052818 A (MORISHITA JINTAN KK) 07 March 1991., & JP3052818 A 19910307 | [A] - DATABASE WPI ON EPOQUE, Week 9748, LONDON: DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., AN 97-521873; & JP 9249576 A (TANAKA) 22 September 1997., & JP9249576 A 19970922 | [A] - DATABASE WPI ON EPOQUE, Week 9729, LONDON: DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., AN 97-311393; & CN 1104897 A (XU S) 12 July 1995., & CN1104897 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 120, No. 11, 14 March 1994, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 869, Abstract No. 132660w, SOFTLY et al., "Composition of Representative SALATRIM Fat Preparations"; & J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., 1994, 42(2), 461-467 (Eng). | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 110, No. 23, 05 June 1989, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 394, Abstract No. 218804b, NISHIDA Y., "Hair Growth Stimulating Tonics Containing Fatty Acid Glyceride Acetates"; & JP 1009912 A (13 January 1989)., & JP1009912 A 19890113 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 99, No. 21, 21 November 1983, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 324, Abstract No. 172219p, TAKAHASHI et al., "Chromatographic Rules in Elution of Individual Molecular Species of Triglyceride"; & NIPPON SUISAN GAKKAISHI, 1983, 49(8), 1301 (Eng). |