Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018138

EP1018138 - SCANNING EVANESCENT ELECTRO-MAGNETIC MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.12.2004  [2004/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
21st floor
300 Lakeside Drive
Oakland, CA 94612-3350 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
21st floor, 300 Lakeside Drive
Oakland, CA 94612-3550 / US
Inventor(s)01 / XIANG, Xiao-Dong
215 Kevington Place
Alameda, CA 94502 / US
02 / GAO, Chen
Apartment 318 434 Central Avenue
Alameda, CA 94501 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date98953178.522.09.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998US19764
Priority number, dateUS19970059471P22.09.1997         Original published format: US 59471 P
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9916102
Date:01.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018138
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/00, G01B7/34, H01J37/20
[2000/50]
Former International [2000/28]H01J37/20, G01B7/34
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE QUERGEDÄMPTE WELLEN- RASTERMIKROSKOP[2000/28]
English:SCANNING EVANESCENT ELECTRO-MAGNETIC MICROSCOPE[2000/28]
French:MICROSCOPE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE EVANESCENT A BALAYAGE[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2000National basic fee paid 
29.03.2000Search fee paid 
29.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
06.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/53]
30.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]  - MASSOOD TABIB-AZAR ET AL, "NON-DESTRUCTIVE CHARACTERIZATION OF MATERIALS BY EVANESCENT MICROWAVES", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY,GB,IOP PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, (19930501), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 0957-0233, pages 583 - 590, XP000362377 [X] 3,8 * Chapter 3.1. *;; figure 1 * [A] 7,9 [Y] 1,2,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/4/5/007
    [DXAY] - WEI T ET AL, "Scanning tip microwave near-field microscope", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (19960610), vol. 68, no. 24, pages 1 - 3, XP002917072 [DX] 3-5,9 * page 2, column L - page 3, column L; figure 1 * [A] 24-28 [Y] 10-13,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.116742
 [DY]  - FEE M ET AL, "Scanning electromagnetic transmission line micriscope with sub-wavelength resolution", OPTICS COMM., (19890101), vol. 69, no. 3,4, pages 219 - 224, XP000885387 [DY] 1,2 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(89)90103-X
 [DYA]  - POZAR, DAVID M, MICROWAVE ENGINEERING, READING, MASSACHUSETTS, ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1990), XP002149688 [DY] 10-13 * page 336 - page 347 * * page 371 - page 373 * [A] 24-28
 [PX]  - GAO C ET AL, "HIGH SPATIAL RESOLUTION QUANTITATIVE MICROWAVE IMPEDANCE MICROSCOPYBY A SCANNING TIP MICROWAVE NEAR-FIELD MICROSCOPE", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19970929), vol. 71, no. 13, ISSN 0003-6951, XP000725818 [PX] 9-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.120444
International search[XE]US5821410  (XIANG XIAO-DONG [US], et al);
 [X]  - WEI T, ET AL., "SCANNING TIP MICROWAVE NEAR-FIELD MICROSCOPE", Applied Physics Letters, A I P Publishing LLC, US, US, (19960610), vol. 68, no. 24, doi:10.1063/1.116742, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 01 - 03, XP002917072

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.116742
 [X]  - TABIB-AZAR M, SHOEMAKER N S, HARRIS S, "NON-DESTRUCTIVE CHARACTERIZATION OF MATERIALS BY EVANESCENT MICROWAVES", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY., IOP, BRISTOL., GB, GB, (19930101), vol. 04, doi:10.1088/0957-0233/4/5/007, ISSN 0957-0233, pages 583 - 590, XP002917073

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/4/5/007
 [A]  - GUTMANN R J, ET AL., "MICROWAVE SCANNING MICROSCOPY FOR PLANAR STRUCTURE DIAGNOSTICS", IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST. LAS VEGAS, JUNE 9 - 11, 1987., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19870601), vol. 01, pages 281 - 284, XP002917074