blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968288

EP0968288 - A HUMAN 2-19 PROTEIN HOMOLOGUE, z219a [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZymoGenetics, Inc.
1201 Eastlake Avenue East
Seattle, WA 98102 / US
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / CONKLIN, Darrell, C.
Apartment 2, 2332 Minor AvenueEast
Seattle, WA 98102 / US
02 / BLUMBERG, Hal
4620 Sunnyside Avenue North
Seattle, WA 98103 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)MacLean, Martin Robert
Mathys & Squire The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/26]MacLean, Martin Robert
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2004/44]Taylor, Kathryn May
Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Former [2000/01]Schlich, George William, et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date98953283.306.10.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US21091
Priority number, dateUS19970061712P06.10.1997         Original published format: US 61712 P
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9918209
Date:15.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968288
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968288
Date:10.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.04.1999
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/12, C12N15/62, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, C12Q1/68, A01K67/027
[2000/01]
CPC:
A01K67/0275 (EP,US); C07K14/47 (EP,US); A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US); C12N2799/022 (EP,US); C12N2799/026 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Z2-19A, EIN MENSCHLICHES HOMOLOG VON DEM PROTEIN 2-19[2005/03]
English:A HUMAN 2-19 PROTEIN HOMOLOGUE, z219a[2000/01]
French:HOMOLOGUE HUMAIN DE LA PROTEINE 2-19, z219a[2005/03]
Former [2000/01]Z219A, EIN MENSCHLICHES HOMOLOG VON PROTIEN 2-19
Former [2000/01]HOMOLOGUE DE PROTEINE 2-19 HUMAINE, z219a
Entry into regional phase25.06.1999National basic fee paid 
25.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/30]
29.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2005Fee for grant paid
13.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI10.08.2005
CY06.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
[2007/21]
Former [2006/30]FI10.08.2005
MC31.10.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
Former [2006/25]FI10.08.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
PT10.01.2006
Former [2006/15]FI10.08.2005
GR10.11.2005
SE10.11.2005
Former [2006/13]FI10.08.2005
SE10.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[XA]  - HILLIER L. ET AL., "H. sapiens cDNA clone 741869 similar to 2-19 protein precursor", GENBANK, (19970501), XP002091835 [X] 1-15 * compare nt 1-550 of AA402132 and nt 330-880 of seq. ID 1 * [A] 16-21
 [A]  - JACOBS K A ET AL, "A genetic selection for isolating cDNAs encoding secreted proteins", GENE: AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON GENES AND GENOMES, (19971001), vol. 198, no. 1-2, page 289-296, XP004116069 [A] 1-21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(97)00330-2
 [A]  - TASHIRO K ET AL, "SIGNAL SEQUENCE TRAP: A CLONING STRATEGY FOR SECRETED PROTEINS AND TYPE I MEMBRANE PROTEINS", SCIENCE, (19930730), vol. 261, pages 600 - 603, XP000673204 [A] 1-21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8342023
 [A]  - YOKOYAMA-KOBAYASHI M ET AL, "A SIGNAL SEQUENCE DETECTION SYSTEM USING SECRETED PROTEASE ACTIVITYAS AN INDICATOR", GENE, (1995), vol. 163, pages 193 - 196, XP002053953 [A] 1-21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(95)00322-W
Examination   - BUCHER P. ET AL: 'a flexible motif search technique based on generalized profiles', COMPUTERS CHEMISTRY, VOL. 20, NO 1, PAGES 2-23
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.