Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1026999

EP1026999 - PHOTOTHERAPY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/33]PHOTOTHERAPY METHODS AND SYSTEMS
[2005/43]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
55 Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
[2006/23]
Former [2000/33]For all designated states
THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
55 Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSON, Richard, Rox
399 Marrett Road
Lexington, MA 02173 / US
02 / DWYER, Peter, J.
282 Newbury Street, Apt 11
Boston, MA 02116 / US
[2000/43]
Former [2000/33]01 / ANDERSON, Richard, Rox
399 Marrett Road
Lexington, MA 02173 / US
02 / DWYER, Peter, J.
71 Charles River Drive
Franklin, MA 02038 / US
Representative(s)von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich , et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98953351.808.10.1998
[2000/33]
WO1998US21355
Priority number, dateUS19970061487P08.10.1997         Original published format: US 61487 P
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9917668
Date:15.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1026999
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1026999
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/06, A61B5/103
[2006/23]
Former International [2001/12]A61B17/36, A61N5/06, A61B5/103
Former International [2000/33]A61B17/36, A61N5/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/33]
TitleGerman:PHOTOTHERAPEUTISCHE SYSTEME[2005/43]
English:PHOTOTHERAPY SYSTEMS[2005/43]
French:SYSTEMES DE PHOTOTHERAPIE[2005/44]
Former [2000/33]PHOTOTHERAPEUTISCHE VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME
Former [2000/33]PHOTOTHERAPY METHODS AND SYSTEMS
Former [2000/33]PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES DE PHOTOTHERAPIE
Entry into regional phase07.04.2000National basic fee paid 
07.04.2000Search fee paid 
07.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
06.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2006Fee for grant paid
16.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06011404.8  / EP1719541
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CY07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
LU08.10.2006
IE09.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT07.11.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
LU08.10.2006
IE09.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2008/21]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
IE09.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2008/16]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
IE09.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/22]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
DK07.09.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/18]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
NL07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/02]AT07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
Former [2006/50]SE07.09.2006
ES18.09.2006
Former [2006/49]SE07.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5556612  (ANDERSON R ROX [US], et al) [Y] 1,8-10 * column 3, line 49 - column 9, line 52 * [A] 3-6;
 [Y]WO9303793  (BIAGGIO ROBERTO ENZO DI [AU]) [Y] 1,8-10 * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 38 - page 10, line 37; table 1 *;
 [A]WO9715226  (ROSSLYN MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,3,4,8,9 * abstract * * page 7, line 12 - line 28 * * page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 18; tables 1,3 *
 [A]  UTTS S R ET AL, "LASER FLUORESCENCE SPECTROSCOPY OF HUMAN SKIN IN VIVO: THE EFFECT OF ERYTHEMA", OPTICS AND SPECTROSCOPY,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. WASHINGTON, (19940501), vol. 76, no. 5, ISSN 0030-400X, pages 771 - 774, XP000456621 [A] 1,8,11 * whole ducument *
International search[X]US5354323  (WHITEBOOK MARK E [US]);
 [Y]US5549599  (SUMIYA TOSHIFUMI [JP]);
 [YP]US5725522  (SINOFSKY EDWARD L [US]);
 [YP]US5814040  (NELSON J STUART [US], et al);
 [A]US5474549  (ORTIZ MARK V [US], et al)