EP1025297 - SINGLE IMPINGEMENT BULKING JET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAIN, Terry, Robin R.D. 2, Box 161 Al Greenwood, DE 19950 / US | 02 /
FROST, Dennis, Leslie 38 Mercer Drive Newark, DE 19713 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Melvin, Harry 21 Mountainview Trail Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | 04 /
TODD, Maurice, Cornelius 106 Harvey Lane Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/32] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98953375.7 | 09.10.1998 | [2000/32] | WO1998US21403 | Priority number, date | US19970956408 | 24.10.1997 Original published format: US 956408 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9922054 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025297 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1025297 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | D02G1/16, D02G1/12 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
D02G1/161 (EP,US);
D02G1/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/32] | Title | German: | EINZELAUFPRALLDÜSE ZUM BAUSCHEN VON GARNEN | [2000/32] | English: | SINGLE IMPINGEMENT BULKING JET | [2000/32] | French: | JET GONFLANT A IMPACT UNIQUE | [2000/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3609216 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 68 *; | [A]FR2310431 (CHOMARAT & CIE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 25 - page 5, line 39 *; | [A]GB2005737 (SNIA VISCOSA) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE2856290 (AKZO GMBH) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1, paragraph 3 - page 7, line 4, paragraph 2 * |