Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032497

EP1032497 - INKJET PRINTING MEDIUM COMPRISING CROSSLINKED PRINTING SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.12.2002
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Huawen
213 Rose Court North
Delmont, PA 15626 / US
02 / WANG, Alan, E.
1032 Old Orchard Drive
Gibsonia PA 15044 / US
03 / HILL, Charles, T.
211 Lynn Drive
New Brighton, PA 15066 / US
04 / SWISHER, Robert
204 Sunridge Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15238 / US
05 / DIEHL, David, A.
310 Nichols Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US
[2000/43]
Former [2000/36]01 / LI, Huawen
213 Rose Court North
Delmont, PA 15626 / US
02 / WANG, Alan, E.
3870 Anjou Lane
Hoffman Estates, IL 60195 / US
03 / HILL, Charles, T.
211 Lynn Drive
New Brighton, PA 15066 / US
04 / SWISHER, Robert
204 Sunridge Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15238 / US
05 / DIEHL, David, A.
310 Nichols Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US
Representative(s)polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date98953800.422.10.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US22209
Priority number, dateUS1997095890728.10.1997         Original published format: US 958907
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9921724
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032497
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032497
Date:06.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/00, B41M7/00, C08J7/04, C09D171/02, C09D133/14
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/36]
TitleGerman:VERNETZTE DRUCKENDE OBERFLÄCHE ENTHALTENDES TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKMEDIUM[2000/36]
English:INKJET PRINTING MEDIUM COMPRISING CROSSLINKED PRINTING SURFACE[2000/36]
French:DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION A JET D'ENCRE COMPRENANT UNE SURFACE D'IMPRESSION RETICULEE[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase25.05.2000National basic fee paid 
25.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
25.08.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2001Fee for grant paid
22.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB22.10.2002
[2004/22]
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2151945  (SANYO KOKUSAKU PULP CO, et al) [A] 1,28,42 * claims 1,13 *;
 [A]WO9722476  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [A] 1,28,42 * claims 1,29 *;
 [A]JPH09174998  ;
 [A]JPH08207423
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 097, no. 011, [A] 1,28,42 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 096, no. 012, [A] 1,28,42 * abstract *