Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032837

EP1032837 - TARGET SEQUENCES FOR SYNTHETIC MOLECULES AND METHODS OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/18]For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland
California 94607-5200 / US
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street
Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TSIEN, Roger, Y.
8535 Nottingham Place
La Jolla, CA 92037-2125 / US
02 / GRIFFIN, Albert, B.
Apartment A, 14023 Mango Drive
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Schnappauf, Georg , et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/10]Schnappauf, Georg , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Former [2000/36]Grund, Martin, Dr. , et al
Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98953881.421.10.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US22363
Priority number, dateUS1997095505021.10.1997         Original published format: US 955050
US1997095520621.10.1997         Original published format: US 955206
US1997095585921.10.1997         Original published format: US 955859
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9921013
Date:29.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032837
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032837
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/566, C07F9/80, C12N15/09, C12N15/64
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:ZIELSEQUENZEN FÜR SYNTHETISCHE MOLEKÜLE UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEREN VERWENDUNG[2000/36]
English:TARGET SEQUENCES FOR SYNTHETIC MOLECULES AND METHODS OF USING SAME[2000/36]
French:SEQUENCES CIBLES POUR MOLECULES SYNTHETIQUES ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERES[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2000National basic fee paid 
11.05.2000Search fee paid 
11.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
24.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2006Fee for grant paid
02.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06005876.5  / EP1684073
Opposition(s)06.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CH03.05.2006
CY03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
LI03.05.2006
NL03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
LU21.10.2006
IE23.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CH03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
LI03.05.2006
NL03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
LU21.10.2006
IE23.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2008/21]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CH03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
LI03.05.2006
NL03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
GR04.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
IE23.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2008/16]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CH03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
LI03.05.2006
NL03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
IE23.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2007/18]AT03.05.2006
BE03.05.2006
CH03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
LI03.05.2006
NL03.05.2006
DK03.08.2006
SE03.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
PT03.10.2006
Former [2007/03]AT03.05.2006
CH03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
LI03.05.2006
SE03.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
Former [2007/02]AT03.05.2006
FI03.05.2006
SE03.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
Former [2006/50]SE03.08.2006
ES14.08.2006
Former [2006/49]SE03.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[PX]  GRIFFIN ET AL, "Specific Covalent Labeling of Recombinant Protein Molecules Inside Live Cells", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19980710), vol. 281, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 269 - 272, XP002116989 [PX] 1-77 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.281.5374.269
International search[A]  - SHI W., ET AL., "THE ROLE OF ARSENIC-THIOL INTERACTIONS IN METALLOREGULATION OF THE ARS OPERON.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19960419), vol. 271., no. 16., doi:10.1074/jbc.271.16.9291, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 9291 - 9297., XP002916000

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.16.9291
 [A]  - KALEF E., WALFISH P. G., GITLER C., "ARSENICAL-BASED AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY OF VICINAL DITHIOL- CONTAINING PROTEINS: PURIFICATION OF L1210 LEUKEMIA CYTOPLASMIC PROTEINS AND THE RECOMBINANT RAT C-ERB ABETA1 T3 RECEPTOR.", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY., ACADEMIC PRESS INC., NEW YORK., NEW YORK., (19930101), vol. 212., doi:10.1006/abio.1993.1337, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 325 - 334., XP002916001

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1993.1337