Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032588

EP1032588 - INTERACTION OF ALPHA-CONOTOXIN PEPTIDES WITH NEURONAL NICOTINIC ACETYLCHOLINE RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.06.2002
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.07.2002  [2002/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Utah Research Foundation
615 Arapeen Drive
Suite 110
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
For all designated states
Case Western Reserve University
Office of University Attorney, Room 109, Delbert Hall, 10900 Euclid Avenue Cleveland
Ohio 44106-7020 / US
For all designated states
Salk Institute
10010 N. Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
For all designated states
Cognetix, Inc.
Suite 201, 421 Wakara Way
Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
The University of Utah Research Foundation
615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 110
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
For all designated states
Case Western Reserve University
Office of University Attorney, Room 109, Delbert Hall, 10900 Euclid Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44106-7020 / US
For all designated states
Salk Institute
10010 N. Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
For all designated states
Cognetix Inc.
Suite 201, 421 Wakara Way
Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHON, Ki-Joon
3136 Huntington Road
Shaker Heights, OH 44120 / US
02 / OLIVERA, Baldomero, M.
1370 Bryan Avenue
Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US
03 / RIVIER, Jean, E.
9674 Blackgold Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
04 / KOERBER, Steven, C.
818 Nardo Road
Encinitas, CA 92024 / US
05 / SHEN, Gregory, S.
2218 Lakeline Circle
Salt Lake City, UT 84109 / US
06 / MCINTOSH, J., Michael
1151 South 2000 East
Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US
07 / CARTIER, G., Edward
Apartment B-216 2629 East Stringham Avenue
Salt Lake City, UT 84109 / US
08 / YOSHIKAMI, Doju
1074 East 600 South
Salt Lake City, UT 84102 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Rambelli, Paolo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Corso Emilia 8
10152 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Rambelli, Paolo , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date98953885.523.10.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US22368
Priority number, dateUS19970062783P24.10.1997         Original published format: US 62783 P
US19970065814P14.11.1997         Original published format: US 65814 P
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9921878
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032588
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.05.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07K7/08, G01N24/08, G01N33/68, G06F17/30, G06F19/00
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:WECHSELWIRKUNG VON ALPHA-CONOTOXINPEPTIDEN MIT NEURONALEN NIKOTINISCHEN ACETYLCHOLIN REZEPTOREN[2000/36]
English:INTERACTION OF ALPHA-CONOTOXIN PEPTIDES WITH NEURONAL NICOTINIC ACETYLCHOLINE RECEPTORS[2000/36]
French:INTERACTION DE PEPTIDES D'ALPHA-CONOTOXINE AVEC DES RECEPTEURS NEURAUX D'ACETYLCHOLINE NICOTINIQUE[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2000National basic fee paid 
22.05.2000Search fee paid 
22.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
03.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/31]
28.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5589340  (OLIVERA BALDOMERO M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,11-14 * SEQ ID NOs 14,15,19, 54 *; column 5, line 5 - line 11 *;
 [X]US5633347  (OLIVERA BALDOMERO M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,11,12,14,20 * SEQ ID NO 14 *; column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 2 *;
 [X]WO9511256  (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1-9,11-14 * page 6, line 1 - line 5 * * page 6, line 12 - line 13 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [PX]WO9824462  (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US]) [PX] 1-9,11-17 * the whole document *
 [X]  CARTIER G E ET AL., "A new alpha-Conotoxin Which Targets alpha3beta2 Nicotinic Acetylcholine Receptors", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, BALTIMORE,MD, US, (19960323), vol. 271, no. 13, pages 7522 - 7528, XP002170539 [X] 1-5,7,8,11,14-17,20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.13.7522
 [X]  FAINZILBER M ET AL., "New Mollusce-Specific alpha-Conotoxin Block Aplysia Neuronal Acetylcholine Receptors", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, pages 9523 - 9529, XP002918807 [X] 1-4,11,14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00198a018
International search[A]US4447356  (OLIVERA BALDOMERO M [US], et al);
 [A]US5418944  (DIPACE LUIGI [IT], et al);
 [X]US5595972  (OLIVERA BALDOMERO M [US], et al);
 [AP]US5703792  (CHAPMAN DAVID [US]);
 [AP]US5780433  (MCINTOSH J MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [XP]WO9822126  (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al);
 [XP]  - CARTIER G E, ET AL., "ALPHA-CONOTOXIN MII: STRUCTURE/ACTIVITY STUDIES OF A POTENT AND SELECTIVE PEPTIDE ANTAGONIST OF THE ALPHA3B2 SUBTYPE OF NEURONAL NICOTINIC ACETYLCHOLINE RECEPTOR", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC., XP002916221
 [XP]  - HU S-H, ET AL., "THE 1.1 AA RESOLUTION CRYSTAL STRUCTURE OF ¬TYR153⁄4EPI, A NOVEL ALPHA-CONOTOXIN FROM CONUS EPISCOPATUS, SOLVED BY DIRECT METHODS", Biochemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19980818), vol. 37, no. 33, doi:10.1021/bi9806549, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 11425 - 11433, XP002916222

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi9806549
 [XP]  - SHON K-J, ET AL., "THREE-DIMENSIONAL SOLUTION STRUCTURE OF ALPHA-CONOTOXIN MII, AN ALPHA3BETA2 NEURONAL NICOTINIC ACETYLCHOLINE RECEPTOR-TARGETED LIGAND", Biochemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19971216), vol. 36, no. 50, doi:10.1021/bi971443r, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 15693 - 15700, XP002916223

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi971443r