Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019609

EP1019609 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FILLING INSULATED GLASS UNITS WITH INSULATING GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CARDINAL IG COMPANY
775 Prairie Center Drive, Suite 200
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
[2005/51]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
CARDINAL IG COMPANY
775 Prairie Center Drive, Suite 200
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
CARDINAL IG COMPANY
12301 Whitewater Drive
Minnetonka, MN 55343-9447 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TRPKOVSKI, Paul
P.O. Box 145
Spring Green, WI 53588 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Parry, Simon James , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Parry, Simon James , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/36]Parry, Simon James , et al
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/29]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98953915.022.10.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998US22437
Priority number, dateUS1997095753224.10.1997         Original published format: US 957532
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922106
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019609
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019609
Date:21.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/677
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM FÜLLEN VON ISOLIERGLASSCHEIBEN MIT ISOLIERGAS[2000/29]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FILLING INSULATED GLASS UNITS WITH INSULATING GAS[2000/29]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE REMPLISSAGE DE VITRAGES ISOLANTS A L'AIDE D'UN GAZ ISOLANT.[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2000National basic fee paid 
02.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
04.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2005Fee for grant paid
12.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
CY21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
IT21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/16]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
IT21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2007/02]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2006/49]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2006/45]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
Former [2006/38]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
Former [2006/34]AT21.12.2005
CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
Former [2006/33]CH21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
LI21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/24]FI21.12.2005
Cited inInternational search[XAY]GB2099057  (LISEC PETER) [X] 1,3,6 * page 1, line 53 - page 2, line 58 * * figure . * [A] 10 [Y] 2,4,5;
 [XAY]DE29504900U  (LISEC PETER [AT]) [X] 10,15 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 19 * * page 10, line 31 - page 11, line 8 * * page 11, line 19 - line 25 * * page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 34 * * page 18, line 26 - page 26, line 40 * * page 27, line 29 - page 28, line 19 * * figure - * [A] 1,3,6,7 [Y] 2,4,5;
 [XA]DE3402323  (INTERPANE ENTW & BERATUNGSGES [DE]) [X] 10-12 * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 35 * * page 13, line 24 - page 17, line 11 * * figure - * [A] 1,4,9;
 [A]EP0056762  (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 1-4,9,10,15 * page 3, line 25 - page 9, line 27; figure - *;
 [A]DE4315986  (HALLE EBERHARD [DE]) [A] 1,3-5,9-12 * column 4, line 54 - column 8, line 65 * * column 9, line 33 - column 10, line 5 * * figure - *;
 [A]DE3115566  (IMPORT EXPORT KG INTERPANE ISO [DE]) [A] 1,5,10 * page 5, line 17 - page 9, line 6; figure - *
by applicantUS5017252
 US4780164
 US5573618
 US5476124