Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1025153

EP1025153 - SQUEAK RESISTANT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DU PONT, Benjamin, F.
P.O. Box 4
Rockland, DE 19732 / US
02 / KOSINSKI, Leonard, Edward, Raymond
3488 Rotherfield Lane
Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US
03 / DUCH, Michael, William
304 Mason Drive
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[2000/32]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Postfach 19 64
85319 Freising / DE
Former [2000/32]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date98954047.130.10.1998
[2000/32]
WO1998US23123
Priority number, dateUS19970063960P31.10.1997         Original published format: US 63960 P
[2000/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9923149
Date:14.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1025153
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999
[2000/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/02, C08K5/06
[2000/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2000/32]
TitleGerman:QUIETSCHRESISTENTER ARTIKEL[2000/32]
English:SQUEAK RESISTANT ARTICLE[2000/32]
French:ARTICLE RESISTANT GRINCEMENT[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2000National basic fee paid 
31.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
26.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/18]
12.02.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XD]US5286773  (STERLING ROBERT E [US], et al) [XD] 1-8 * column 5, lines 4-21; examples 1-3 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 11 *;
 [X]US5643516  (RAZA IRFAN F [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 5; claim 3 *