Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970429

EP0970429 - DISTRIBUTED SERVICE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.12.2005
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.01.2006  [2006/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2003/41]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION
World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / TRUDEAU, Joseph, Jean-Paul, Denis
109 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K1R 6M2 / CA
02 / CRADDOCK, Arthur, Julian, Patterson
6486 Waddion Drive
Greely, Ontario K4P 1E7 / CA
03 / KHUWAJA, Ramzan, A.
18 Deerfield Drive NO. 1603
Nepean, Ontario K2G 4L1 / CA
04 / ARMSTRONG, Steve, Michael
24 Hillview Road
Nepean, Ontario K2H 5G5 / CA
05 / PARSONS, Eric, Walter
19 Carlisle Circle
Ashton, Ontario K0A 1BO / CA
06 / MACFARLANE, Ian, Alexander
15 Victor Street
Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1H9 / CA
[2000/21]
Former [2000/02]01 / TRUDEAU, Joseph, Jean-Paul, Denis
109 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K1R 6M2 / CA
02 / CRADDOCK, Arthur, Julian, Patterson
6486 Waddion Drive
Greely, Ontario K4P 1E7 / CA
03 / KHUWAJA, Ramzan, A.
18 Deerfield Drive NO. 1603
Nepean, Ontario K2G 4L1 / CA
04 / ARMSTRONG, Steve, Michael
24 Hillview Road
Nepean, Ontario K2H 5G5 / CA
05 / PARSONS, Eric, Walter
3 Lakewood Drive
Richmond, Ontario K0A 2Z0 / CA
06 / MACFARLANE, Ian, Alexander
15 Victor Street
Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1H9 / CA
Representative(s)Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Coyle, Philip Aidan , et al
F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2000/18]Dearling, Bruce Clive , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2000/02]Funnell, Samantha Jane , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date98954080.209.11.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998CA01047
Priority number, dateCA1997222057810.11.1997         Original published format: CA 2220578
CA1997222057910.11.1997         Original published format: CA 2220579
CA1997222058010.11.1997         Original published format: CA 2220580
CA1997222064110.11.1997         Original published format: CA 2220641
US1998004113112.03.1998         Original published format: US 41131
US1998004113012.03.1998         Original published format: US 41130
US1998004112912.03.1998         Original published format: US 41129
US1998004112812.03.1998         Original published format: US 41128
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9925071
Date:20.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970429
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/22
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERTEILTES DIENSTSNETZWERK[2000/02]
English:DISTRIBUTED SERVICE NETWORK[2000/02]
French:RESEAU DE SERVICES A REPARTITION[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase01.07.1999National basic fee paid 
01.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
08.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/04]
24.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9323817  (RELEASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS RMS [US], et al) [A] 1-42,57-73 * figures 1-5,7-9 * * page 6, line 14 - page 10, line 28 *