Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032332

EP1032332 - A FOOT AND SHIN COMPONENT FOR A LOWER LIMB PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHAS. A. BLATCHFORD & SONS LIMITED
Lister Road Basingstoke
Hampshire RG22 4AH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
CHAS. A. BLATCHFORD & SONS LIMITED
Lister Road
Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4AH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / SHORTER, John Jeffrey
9 Chandlers Reach, Itchenor
Chichester, West Sussex PO20 7BD / GB
02 / EVANS, Andrew John Sear
12 Vine Lane, Boundstone
Farnham, Surrey GU10 4TD / GB
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Blatchford, William Michael , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Blatchford, William Michael , et al
Withers & Rogers Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date98954637.918.11.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998GB03477
Priority number, dateGB1997002468021.11.1997         Original published format: GB 9724680
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9926563
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032332
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032332
Date:29.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/60, B29C67/00
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:FUSS- UND SCHIENBEINTEIL FÜR EINE UNTERSCHENKELPROTHESE[2001/19]
English:A FOOT AND SHIN COMPONENT FOR A LOWER LIMB PROSTHESIS[2000/36]
French:ENSEMBLE TIBIA ET PIED POUR PROTHESE DE MEMBRE INFERIEUR[2000/36]
Former [2000/36]EIN FUSS- UND SCHIENBEIN- KOMPONENT FÜR EINE UNTERSCHENKELPROTHESE
Entry into regional phase13.06.2000National basic fee paid 
16.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
02.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
12.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
04.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2002Fee for grant paid
08.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.05.2002
BE29.05.2002
CH29.05.2002
FI29.05.2002
GR29.05.2002
LI29.05.2002
NL29.05.2002
DK29.08.2002
PT29.08.2002
IE18.11.2002
LU18.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2004/39]AT29.05.2002
BE29.05.2002
CH29.05.2002
GR29.05.2002
LI29.05.2002
NL29.05.2002
DK29.08.2002
PT29.08.2002
IE18.11.2002
LU18.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
Former [2004/10]AT29.05.2002
BE29.05.2002
CH29.05.2002
GR29.05.2002
LI29.05.2002
NL29.05.2002
DK29.08.2002
PT29.08.2002
IE18.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
Former [2004/02]AT29.05.2002
BE29.05.2002
CH29.05.2002
GR29.05.2002
LI29.05.2002
NL29.05.2002
DK29.08.2002
PT29.08.2002
IE18.11.2002
Former [2003/48]AT29.05.2002
BE29.05.2002
CH29.05.2002
GR29.05.2002
LI29.05.2002
NL29.05.2002
DK29.08.2002
PT29.08.2002
Former [2003/46]AT29.05.2002
CH29.05.2002
GR29.05.2002
LI29.05.2002
NL29.05.2002
DK29.08.2002
PT29.08.2002
Former [2003/21]AT29.05.2002
CH29.05.2002
GR29.05.2002
LI29.05.2002
NL29.05.2002
PT29.08.2002
Former [2003/20]AT29.05.2002
CH29.05.2002
GR29.05.2002
LI29.05.2002
NL29.05.2002
Former [2003/16]AT29.05.2002
CH29.05.2002
LI29.05.2002
NL29.05.2002
Former [2003/10]AT29.05.2002
NL29.05.2002
Former [2003/09]NL29.05.2002
Cited inInternational search[YDA]GB2304289  (CHAS A BLATCHFORD AND SONS LIM [GB]) [YD] 1,9,11-14 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [YA]DE4125635  (SCHMITT THOMAS [DE]) [Y] 1,9,11-14 * the whole document * [A] 15,22;
 [A]US5133775  (CHEN SEN-JUNG [TW]) [A] 2,3,8,9 * column W *;
 [A]US2684487  (HANSEN STEVEN L, et al) [A] 2,3,8 * column W *;
 [A]US3400408  (VILLALTA GARCIA RAFAEL) [A] 15,22 * column 5, line 68 - column 6, line 13; figure 10 *;
 [A]WO9608216  (MODEL & INSTR DEV CORP [US]) [A] 15,22 * figures 6-10; claim 26 *;
 [A]GB2085351  (BLATCHFORD CHAS A AND SONS LTD) [A] 15,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0454524  (PROTEOR SA [FR]);
 [A]DE29706610U  (HARTMANN ANDREAS [DE]);
 [A]US5376127  (SWANSON VERN M [US])
by applicantGB2304289