Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036762

EP1036762 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING IRON CARBIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.04.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.05.2001 [2001/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Kobe shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
For all designated states
MITSUBISHI CORPORATION
6-3 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8086 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
For all designated states
MITSUBISHI CORPORATION
6-3 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8086 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIYASHITA, Torakatsu
5-23, Higashi-Ochiai 2-chome, Suma-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 654-0152 / JP
02 / KISHIMOTO, Mitsuharu
185-3, Nozoe 2-chome, Harima-cho
Kako-gun, Hyogo 675-0151 / JP
03 / NAKAZAWA, Teruyuki
19-10, Higashi-machi 3-chome
Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-0011 / JP
04 / NIO, Akio
1-3, Matsuyama 3-chome
Kiyose-shi, Tokyo204-0022 / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date98954809.424.11.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998JP05281
Priority number, dateJP1997033422704.12.1997         Original published format: JP 33422797
[2000/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928235
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036762
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:C01B31/30, C21B15/00
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   GB [2000/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EISENKARBID[2000/38]
English:METHOD OF MANUFACTURING IRON CARBIDE[2000/38]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CARBURE DE FER[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2000Translation filed 
30.06.2000National basic fee paid 
30.06.2000Search fee paid 
30.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
30.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
03.04.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[X]JPH09278428  (NIPPON STEEL CORP);
 [X]JPH0948604  (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD, et al);
 [Y]JPH06501983  (IRON CARBIDE HOLDINGS LTD [US]);
 [Y]JPS5362717  (HAZEN RESEARCH [US])