Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1028628

EP1028628 - PESTICIDE AGAINST PLANT-PATHOGENIC MICROORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 11.07.2018  [2018/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KOPPERT B.V.
Veilingweg 17
2651 BE Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL
For all designated states
Campina B.V.
9, Hogeweg
5301 LB Zaltbommel / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/09]For all designated states
KOPPERT B.V.
Veilingweg 17, Postbus 155
2650 AD Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL
For all designated states
Campina B.V.
9, Hogeweg
5301 LB Zaltbommel / NL
Former [2002/30]For all designated states
KOPPERT B.V.
Veilingweg 17, Postbus 155
2651 AD Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL
For all designated states
Campina B.V.
9, Hogeweg
5301 LB Zaltbommel / NL
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
KOPPERT B.V.
Veilingweg 17, Postbus 155
2651 AD Berkel en Rodenrijs / NL
For all designated states
CAMPINA MELKUNIE B.V.
NCB-laan 80
NL-5462 GE Veghel / NL
Inventor(s)01 / RAVENSBERG, Willem, Jacobus
Populierenzoom 1
NL-2719 HL Zoetermeer / NL
02 / VAN DER PAS, Richard, Karel
Josine Simons-Meespad 20
NL-3066 GD Rotterdam / NL
03 / KUSSENDRAGER, Klaas, Daniel
Eksterdonk 17
NL-5467 DN Veghel / NL
04 / MAAS, Johannes, Antonius, Maria
St. Michaelstraat 12
NL-5421 NK Gemert / NL
 [2002/16]
Former [2000/34]01 / RAVENSBERG, Willem, Jacobus
Populierenzoom 1
NL-2719 HL Zoetermeer / NL
02 / VAN DER PAS, Richard, Karel
Josine Simons-Meespad 20
NL-3066 GD Rotterdam / NL
03 / KUSSENDRAGER, Klaas, Dani[l
Eksterdonk 17
NL-5467 DN Veghel / NL
04 / MAAS, Johannes, Antonius, Maria
St. Micha[lstraat 12
NL-5421 NK Gemert / NL
Representative(s)van Someren, Petronella F. H. M. , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M. , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinkplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2000/34]Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M. , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98954839.105.11.1998
[2000/34]
WO1998NL00640
Priority number, dateNL1997100745705.11.1997         Original published format: NL 1007457
[2000/34]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922597
Date:14.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1028628
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999
[2000/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1028628
Date:26.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01N63/00
[2000/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/34]
TitleGerman:BEKÄMPFUNGSMITTEL GEGEN PFLANZENPATHOGENE MIKRO-ORGANISMEN[2000/34]
English:PESTICIDE AGAINST PLANT-PATHOGENIC MICROORGANISMS[2000/34]
French:PESTICIDE CONTRE DES MICRO-ORGANISMES PHYTOPATHOGENES[2000/34]
Entry into regional phase05.11.1998Translation filed 
23.05.2000National basic fee paid 
23.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
04.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2002Fee for grant paid
25.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES26.02.2003
CY05.11.2003
LU05.11.2003
[2018/28]
Former [2004/39]CY05.11.2003
LU05.11.2003
Former [2004/36]CY05.11.2003
Cited inInternational search[XD]WO9111105  (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [XD] 1,3-5,19,23 * claim - *;
 [X]  - "ANTI-MICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19920101), no. 333, page 92, XP000281314 [X] 1,3-5,20-23 * see the whole disclosure *
 [A]  - URS N.V.R.R. ET AL., "Bactericidal activity of horseradisch peroxidase on Xanthomonas phaseoli var. sojensis", PHYTOPATHOLOGY, (1974), vol. 64, no. 4, pages 542 - 545, XP002096092