Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021615

EP1021615 - SCREEN PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.01.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.03.2003  [2003/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valmet Fibertech AB
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
[2000/42]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
SUNDS DEFIBRATOR INDUSTRIES AB
S-851 94 Sundsvall / SE
Inventor(s)01 / TOLVANEN, Mika
Basgrand 21
S-856 44 Sundsvall / SE
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Sundqvist, Hans
Valmet Fibertech AB
Patents Department
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Sundqvist, Hans
Valmet Fibertech AB Patents Department
851 94 Sundsvall / SE
Application number, filing date98954901.909.11.1998
[2000/30]
WO1998SE02018
Priority number, dateSE1997000409307.11.1997         Original published format: SE 9704093
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9924663
Date:20.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1021615
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999
[2000/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE20.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:D21D5/16
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   PT,   SE [2000/30]
TitleGerman:SIEBPLATTE[2000/30]
English:SCREEN PANEL[2000/30]
French:PLATINE D'EPURATION[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase04.04.2000National basic fee paid 
04.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
06.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
08.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/10]
20.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]SE441108  (CELLECO AB [SE]);
 [A]EP0357382  (AHLSTROEM OY [FI]);
 [A]EP0287267  (BLACK CLAWSON CO [US])