EP1040574 - ARTIFICIAL LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTALFÖRSVARETS FORSKNINGSINSTITUT 172 90 Stockholm / SE | [2005/11] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states FÖRSVARETS FORSKNINGSANSTALT 172 90 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUACHA, Aziz Mellangardsvägen 8 S-597 92 Atvidaberg / SE | 02 /
CARLEGRIM, Börje Ekeby S-590 62 Linghem / SE | [2005/10] |
Former [2000/40] | 01 /
OUACHA, Aziz Mellang rdsvägen 8 S-597 92 tvidaberg / SE | ||
02 /
CARLEGRIM, Börje Ekeby S-590 62 Linghem / SE | Representative(s) | Hedefält, Dag, et al Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten 115 88 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Hedefält, Dag, et al Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten 115 88 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 98954902.7 | 10.11.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998SE02021 | Priority number, date | SE19970004758 | 19.12.1997 Original published format: SE 9704758 | [2000/40] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935740 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040574 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040574 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/26, H03H7/30 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
H03H11/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | KÜNSTLICHE LEITUNG | [2004/42] | English: | ARTIFICIAL LINE | [2000/40] | French: | LIGNE ARTIFICIELLE | [2000/40] |
Former [2000/40] | KÜNSTLICHE LINIE | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1998 | Translation filed | 26.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 12.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 06.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2005 | BE | 23.03.2005 | CH | 23.03.2005 | FI | 23.03.2005 | LI | 23.03.2005 | NL | 23.03.2005 | DK | 23.06.2005 | GR | 23.06.2005 | ES | 04.07.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | CY | 10.11.2005 | IE | 10.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
ES | 04.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 10.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
ES | 04.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 10.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
ES | 04.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
NL | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
ES | 04.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
BE | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4443772 (SCHWARZMANN ALFRED [US]); | [A]US4885562 (OUVRARD PIERRE-LOUIS [FR], et al); | [A]USH954H | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 33RD MIDWEST SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 12-15 August 1990. |