Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032719

EP1032719 - AMORPHOUS NON-LAMINAR NICKEL AND/OR COBALT PHOSPHOROUS ALLOYS, THEIR PROCESS OF MANUFACTURE AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2004
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Techmetals Inc.
345 Springfield Street
Dayton, OH 45403 / US
[2000/36]
Inventor(s)01 / RICHARDSON, Rick, Allen
4856 Philadelphia Drive
Dayton, OH 45404 / US
02 / BROCKMAN, Daniel, A.
8440 Frederick Pike
Dayton, OH 45414-1231 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Caldwell, Judith Margaret , et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Caldwell, Judith Margaret , et al
David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1AG / GB
Application number, filing date98955023.120.10.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US22221
Priority number, dateUS1997095306520.10.1997         Original published format: US 953065
US19980099633P16.10.1998         Original published format: US 99633 P
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9920807
Date:29.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1032719
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032719
Date:26.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C22C45/00
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/36]
TitleGerman:NICHT-LAMINARE AMORPHE NICKEL- UND/ODER COBALTLEGIERUNG MIT PHOSPHOR, IHRE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2000/36]
English:AMORPHOUS NON-LAMINAR NICKEL AND/OR COBALT PHOSPHOROUS ALLOYS, THEIR PROCESS OF MANUFACTURE AND USES[2000/36]
French:ALLIAGES DE NI-P ET/OU CO-P AMORPHES NON LAMINAIRES, LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2000National basic fee paid 
28.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
24.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2002Fee for grant paid
19.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR26.02.2003
IT26.02.2003
ES28.08.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FR26.02.2003
ES28.08.2003
Former [2004/04]ES28.08.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9002220  (FLUEHMANN AG WERNER [CH]) [X] 1-29,42-51 * claims 2,3,10 *;
 [X]JPH02101192  ;
 [X]  - DINI, J. W. ET AL, "Diamond tool wear of electrodeposited nickel-phosphorus alloy", PROC. AESF ANNU. TECH. CONF. (1990), 77TH(VOL. 2), 1315-29 CODEN: PATCEY, XP002100152 [X] 1-63 * see abstract *
 [X]  - BECHER, U. (INSTITUT FUR WERKSTOFFE (BOCHUM)) ET AL, "Electrodeposition of nickel-phosphorus alloys in microstructures.[Galvanische Abscheidung von Nickel-Phosphor-Legierungen in Mikrostrukturen.].", GALVANOTECHNIK (1995) 86, (10), 3180-3186, PHOTOMICROGRAPHS, GRAPHS, 3 REF. ISSN: 0016-4232, XP002100153 [X] 1-63 * see abstract *
 [X]  - POUDEROUX, P. ET AL, "Plating of nickel-phosphorus multilayer alloys: current pulse effects on the microstructural and mechanical properties", SURF. COAT. TECHNOL. (1991), 45(1-3), 161-70 CODEN: SCTEEJ;ISSN: 0257-8972, XP002100154 [X] 1-63 * se abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0257-8972(91)90219-M
 [X]  - CAVALLOTTI, P. ET AL, "Electroless nickel and cobalt baths for magnetic recording disks", PROC. - ELECTROCHEM. SOC. (1988), 88-23(PROC. SYMP. ELECTROCHEM. TECHNOL. ELECTRON., 1987), 445-61 CODEN: PESODO;ISSN: 0161-6374, XP002100155 [X] 1-63 * see abstract *
 [X]  - DUBOWIK, J. ET AL, "Preparation and magnetic properties of compositionally modulated nickel phosphorus/nickel cobalt phosphorus amorphous films", ACTA PHYS. POL., A (1987), A72(2), 259-61 CODEN: ATPLB6;ISSN: 0587-4246, XP002100156 [X] 1-63 * see abstract *
 [X]  - RATZKER, MENACHEM ET AL, "Electrodeposition and corrosion performance of nickel-phosphorus amorphou alloys", PLAT. SURF. FINISH. (1986), 73(9), 74-82 CODEN: PSFMDH;ISSN: 0360-3164, XP002100157 [X] 1-63 * see abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900629), vol. 014, no. 304, Database accession no. (C - 0734), [X] 1-29,42-51 * abstract *
 [X]  - MOTOKAZU YAMAMOTO ET AL, "CRYSTALLIZATION AND ANOMALOUS THERMAL EXPANSION OF AMORPHOUS NI-P ALLOY", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19910601), vol. 30, no. 6A PART 02, pages L1036 - L1038, XP000236711 [X] 1-29,36-39,48,49 * see column 1, page l1036 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.30.L1036
 [X]  - RIVEIRO J M ET AL, "DENDRITIC GROWTH OF ELECTRODEPOSITED CO-P AMORPHOUS ALLOYS", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (19930702), vol. 160, no. 1 / 02, pages 18 - 22, XP000385588 [X] 1-29,36-40 * see conclusion and page 18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(93)90279-7
Examination   - Zeller, R. et al., "Electrodeposition of ductile nickel-phosphorus amorphus alloys using periodic reverse current", J. Electrochem. Soc. (1991), 138(4),1010-17. Nee, C. et al., "The banded structure of nickel phosphorus electrodeposits", Surf. Technol. (1985), 25(12), 7-15