Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1023045

EP1023045 - DELIVERY VEHICLES FOR BIOACTIVE AGENTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEORX CORPORATION
410 West Harrison Street Seattle
Washington 98119 / US
For all designated states
Southern Research Institute
2000 Ninth Avenue South Birmingham
Alabama 35205 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
NEORX CORPORATION
410 West Harrison Street
Seattle Washington 98119 / US
For all designated states
Southern Research Institute
2000 Ninth Avenue South
Birmingham Alabama 35205 / US
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
NEORX CORPORATION
410 West Harrison Street
Seattle Washington 98119 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUNZ, Lawrence, L.
2310 223rd Court Northeast
Redmond, WA 98053 / US
02 / TICE, Thomas, R.
1915 Forest River Court
Hoover, AL 35244 / US
03 / LIBBY, Randell, T.
4933 166th Court Northeast
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
04 / MCDANIEL, Christopher, W.
2015 Crosscrest Drive
Hoover, AL 35244 / US
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/31]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98955098.323.10.1998
[2000/31]
WO1998US22552
Priority number, dateUS19970063114P24.10.1997         Original published format: US 63114 P
US1997095669424.10.1997         Original published format: US 956694
[2000/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9921533
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1023045
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999
[2000/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/107, A61K48/00
[2000/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/31]
TitleGerman:VERABREICHUNGSTRÄGER FÜR BIOAKTIVEN WIRKSTOFFEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2000/31]
English:DELIVERY VEHICLES FOR BIOACTIVE AGENTS AND USES THEREOF[2000/31]
French:VEHICULES DE FOURNITURE D'AGENTS BIOACTIFS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2000/31]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2000National basic fee paid 
22.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
10.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/25]
14.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US3384544  (WALTON CLIVE A, et al) [X] 1-7,12-15,18-44,46-68 * claims 1,9 * * column 2, line 59 - column 6, line 53 *;
 [AD]WO9711682  (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US]) [AD] 1-71 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9511700  (PHARMOS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-71 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0399843  (CHIRON CORP [US]) [A] 1-71 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0682942  (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-71 * the whole document *