Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1029167

EP1029167 - AN ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY POLLUTION FREE, HIGHLY EFFICIENT INDUSTRIAL POWER GENERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.12.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beichel, Rudi
3244 Shasta Way
Sacramento, CA 95821 / US
[2000/34]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/34]
Representative(s)Powell, Stephen David , et al
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
[2009/49]
Former [2000/34]Powell, Stephen David , et al
WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES, 4 St Paul's Churchyard
London EC4M 8AY / GB
Application number, filing date98955147.827.10.1998
[2000/34]
WO1998US22763
Priority number, dateUS19970063405P28.10.1997         Original published format: US 63405 P
US1998017836423.10.1998         Original published format: US 178364
[2000/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9922127
Date:
[1999/18]
Type: A1  Application with search report
No.:EP1029167
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/34]
Search report(s)
ClassificationInternational:F02C3/22, F02C3/30, F01K21/04, F02C3/34
[2000/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/34]
TitleGerman:UMWELTFREUNDLICHES HOCHTECHNOLOGIE KRAFTWERK MIT SEHR GROSSEM WIRKUNGSGRAD[2000/34]
English:AN ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY POLLUTION FREE, HIGHLY EFFICIENT INDUSTRIAL POWER GENERATION SYSTEM[2000/34]
French:SYSTEME DE PRODUCTION INDUSTRIELLE D'ENERGIE A RENDEMENT ELEVE, NON POLLUANT ET DE TECHNOLOGIE DE POINTE[2000/34]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2000National basic fee paid 
22.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
08.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/04]
22.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9607024  (BEICHEL RUDI [US]) [X] 1-24,26,27 * the whole document *;
 [XP]US5715673  (BEICHEL RUDI [US]) [XP] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4434613  (STAHL CHARLES R [US]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [XP]US5724805  (GOLOMB DAN S [US], et al) [XP] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO9744574  (NONOX ENG AB [SE], et al) [XP] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0634562  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0546501  (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5617719  (GINTER J LYELL [US]) [A] 1,8-13 * figure 1 *
by applicantUS5709077