Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1027795

EP1027795 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING AN EXTENSIBLE AUTHENTICATION MECHANISM IN A WEB APPLICATION SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.12.2004  [2004/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ORACLE CORPORATION
500 Oracle Parkway
Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US
[2000/33]
Inventor(s)01 / PANG, Robert
1283 Susan Way
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / STABILE, Jim
530 Clark Court
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
 [2001/03]
Former [2000/33]01 / PANG, Robert
1240 Dale Avenue 19
Mountain View, CA 94041 / US
02 / STABILE, Jim
530 Clark Court
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date98955165.029.10.1998
[2000/33]
WO1998US22832
Priority number, dateUS1997096179631.10.1997         Original published format: US 961796
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9923786
Date:
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A2  Application without search report
No.:EP1027795
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1027795
Date:07.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/02]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1027795
Date:08.09.2004
[2004/37]
Search report(s)International search reportEP15.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, G06F9/46, G06F1/00
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/33]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINRICHTUNG EINES ERWEITERBAREN AUTHENTIZIERUNGS- MECHANISMUS IN EINEM WEB- ANWENDUNGS- SERVER[2000/33]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING AN EXTENSIBLE AUTHENTICATION MECHANISM IN A WEB APPLICATION SERVER[2000/33]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE D'UN MECANISME EXTENSIBLE D'AUTHENTIFICATION DANS UN SERVEUR D'APPLICATION DU WEB[2000/33]
Entry into regional phase30.05.2000National basic fee paid 
30.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.04.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
19.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2003Fee for grant paid
25.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]US5649099  (THEIMER MARVIN M [US], et al) [A] 1,17 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 15 * * column 7, line 54 - column 12, line 53 *;
 [A]  - EDWARDS N ET AL, "High security Web servers and gateways", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, (199709), vol. 29, no. 8-13, page 927-938, XP004095292 [A] 33 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [03.1] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [04.4] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(97)00054-8