Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1027542

EP1027542 - PITOT TUBE PUMP HAVING AXIAL-STABILIZING CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.06.2004  [2004/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Envirotech Pumpsystems, Inc.
440 West 800 South
Salt Lake City, Utah 84110-0209 / US
[2000/33]
Inventor(s)01 / ANGLE, Thomas, L.
3750 Thomasson Lane
Suisun, CA 94585 / US
02 / SHAW, James, G.
923 East Pond Ridge Drive
Draper, UT 84020 / US
03 / MANGANO, James, V.
7973 Hunters Meadow Circle
Sandy, UT 84093 / US
04 / QUINN, Joel
1108 Chavez Drive
South Jordan, UT 84095 / US
05 / OSBORN, Steven, D.
9039 South 1660 East
Sandy, UT 84093 / US
06 / STAFF, Gary, M.
1008 East 11780 South
Sandy, UT 84094 / US
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Vleck, Jan Montagu
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Vleck, Jan Montagu
Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date98955218.729.10.1998
[2000/33]
WO1998US23129
Priority number, dateUS1997095858729.10.1997         Original published format: US 958587
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922144
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1027542
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999
[2000/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:F04D1/12
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/33]
TitleGerman:PITOTPUMPE MIT AXIALER STABILISIERUNG[2000/33]
English:PITOT TUBE PUMP HAVING AXIAL-STABILIZING CONSTRUCTION[2000/33]
French:POMPE DE TYPE TUBE DE PITOT PRESENTANT UNE CONSTRUCTION DE STABILISATION AXIALE[2000/33]
Entry into regional phase24.05.2000National basic fee paid 
24.05.2000Search fee paid 
24.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
30.04.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US4264269  (ERICKSON JOHN W, et al);
 [Y]US3358772  (WALTER BUNYAN THOMAS);
 [A]US3274938  (MCCRACKEN PAUL B);
 [A]US5192142  (HYLL JOHN [US])