Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032943

EP1032943 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PLASMA BY MICROWAVE IRRADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/36]
Inventor(s)01 / WEBER, Thomas
Rossbühlstrasse 1
D-70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE
02 / VOIGT, Johannes
Stöckhofstrasse 47
D-71229 Leonberg / DE
03 / LUCAS, Susanne
Belaustrasse 9
D-70195 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Gleiss & Grosse
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]Gleiss & Grosse
Maybachstrasse 6 A
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98955327.615.09.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998DE02727
Priority number, dateDE199714079217.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19740792
[2000/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9914787
Date:25.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1032943
Date:06.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/32
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES PLASMAS DURCH EINSTRAHLUNG VON MIKROWELLEN[2000/36]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING PLASMA BY MICROWAVE IRRADIATION[2000/36]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN PLASMA PAR EXPOSITION A DES MICRO-ONDES[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase17.04.2000National basic fee paid 
17.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
08.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/13]
15.01.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/13]
Appeal following examination15.07.2002Appeal received No.  T0906/02
24.08.2002Statement of grounds filed
15.01.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XY]JPH05194091  ;
 [Y]JPH03261136  ;
 [XA]JPH01149965  ;
 [A]US5395453  (NODA SHOZO [JP]) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 14 - line 22 * * column 5, line 24 - line 35 * * column 6, line 60 - line 65 *;
 [A]US4891118  (OOIWA KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 10,12,13,17-19 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 34 * * column 3, line 56 - line 59; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5514603  (SATO JUNICHI [JP]) [A] 1,3,7-10,12-16,22 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 22; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS6355929  ;
 [A]JPS62171990  ;
 [A]JPH06139978  ;
 [A]US5217748  (KESTELMAN VLADIMIR N [US], et al) [A] 9,17,18 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 24 *;
 [A]US5378284  (GEISLER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1,8,10,15,23 * column 2, line 20 - line 44 *
 [XY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 35, Database accession no. 93-278138, XP002094754 & JPH05194091 A 19930803 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEM CO) [X] 1,2,7,8,11-13,15 * abstract * [Y] 3
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920219), vol. 016, no. 067, Database accession no. (E - 1168), & JP03261136 A 19911121 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 3 * abstract *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890913), vol. 013, no. 414, Database accession no. (C - 635), & JP01149965 A 19890613 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 3
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880730), vol. 012, no. 277, Database accession no. (E - 640), & JP63055929 A 19880310 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [A] 6,9,20 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880116), vol. 012, no. 015, Database accession no. (C - 469), & JP62171990 A 19870728 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 9,10,20 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940812), vol. 018, no. 434, Database accession no. (E - 1592), & JP06139978 A 19940520 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD:THE) [A] 11 * abstract *