Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048089

EP1048089 - GLASS FIBRE- REINFORCED ABSORBING SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.03.2003  [2003/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amer-Sil S.A.
Zone Industrielle
8287 Kehlen / LU
[2000/44]
Inventor(s)01 / DE M. FERREIRA, Antonio, L.
460, route de Longwy
L-1940 Luxembourg / LU
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph
Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A.
234, route d'Arlon
B.P. 48
8001 Strassen / LU
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph
Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48
8001 Strassen / LU
Application number, filing date98955446.414.10.1998
[2000/44]
WO1998EP06500
Priority number, dateLU1997009014915.10.1997         Original published format: LU 90149
[2000/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9919922
Date:22.04.1999
Language:FR
[1999/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1048089
Date:02.11.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048089
Date:03.04.2002
Language:FR
[2002/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/16, B32B17/10
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [2000/44]
Extension statesRO20.03.2000
SI20.03.2000
TitleGerman:MIT GLASFASERN VERSTÄRKTER, SAUGFÄHIGER SEPARATOR[2000/44]
English:GLASS FIBRE- REINFORCED ABSORBING SEPARATOR[2000/44]
French:SEPARATEUR ABSORBANT RENFORCE EN FIBRES DE VERRE[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2000National basic fee paid 
20.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
15.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2001Fee for grant paid
15.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS58176866  ;
 [A]JPS63148535  ;
 [A]EP0507090  (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 5, line 6 - column 7, line 26 *;
 [A]US4262068  (KONO MIGAKI, et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO9222705  (DUMAS BERNARD [FR]) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840120), vol. 008, no. 013, Database accession no. (E - 222), [A] 1-13 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881027), vol. 012, no. 407, Database accession no. (E - 675), [A] 1-13 * abstract *