Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1025253

EP1025253 - POSITIVE-NEGATIVE SELECTION FOR HOMOLOGOUS RECOMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  26.06.2009
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2000/32]
Inventor(s)01 / AUER, Johannes
Angerstr.7
D-82445 Schwalgen / DE
02 / SPRENGER, Raimund
Schiessstattsiedlung 19
D-82362 Weilheim / DE
03 / HONOLD, Konrad
Südstrasse 24
D-82377 Penzberg / DE
 [2004/10]
Former [2000/32]01 / AUER, Johannes
Birkenstrasse 29
D-82377 Penzberg / DE
02 / SPRENGER, Raimund
Färbergasse 19
D-82362 Weilheim / DE
03 / HONOLD, Konrad
Südstrasse 24
D-82377 Penzberg / DE
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Weickmann & Partner, Kopernikusstrasse 9
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98955483.720.10.1998
[2000/32]
WO1998EP06616
Priority number, dateEP1997011817520.10.1997         Original published format: EP 97118175
[2000/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9920780
Date:29.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1025253
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1025253
Date:03.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/10]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1025253
Date:29.07.2009
Language:DE
[2009/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/90, C12N15/65, C12N15/82
[2000/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/32]
TitleGerman:POSITIV-NEGATIV-SELEKTION BEI DER HOMOLOGEN REKOMBINATION[2000/32]
English:POSITIVE-NEGATIVE SELECTION FOR HOMOLOGOUS RECOMBINATION[2000/32]
French:SELECTION PAR GENE MARQUEUR POSITIF OU NEGATIF LORS D'UNE RECOMBINAISON HOMOLOGUE[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase13.04.2000National basic fee paid 
13.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
31.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2003Fee for grant paid
12.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.11.2004  09.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Institut Pasteur
25-28, rue du Docteur Roux
F-75724 PARIS CEDEX 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2008/35]
Opponent(s)01  30.11.2004  09.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Institut Pasteur
25-28, rue du Docteur Roux
F-75724 PARIS CEDEX 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
ERNEST GUTMANN - YVES PLASSERAUD S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2005/10]
Opponent(s)01  30.11.2004  09.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
INSTITUT PASTEUR
25-28, rue du Docteur Roux
F-75724 PARIS CEDEX 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SA 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2005/04]
Opponent(s)01  30.11.2004  09.12.2004  ADMISSIBLE
INSTITUT PASTEUR
25-28, rue du Docteur Roux
F-75724 PARIS CEDEX 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2005/03]
Opponent(s)01  30.11.2004   
INSTITUT PASTEUR
25-28, rue du Docteur Roux
F-75724 PARIS CEDEX 15 / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SA 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
13.01.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.05.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.06.2005Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2005Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
16.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.12.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.01.2009Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.04.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
17.06.2009Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[YA]US5464764  (CAPECCHI MARIO R [US], et al) [Y] 1 * das ganze Document, insbesondere Spalte 7, Zeilen 43-54 * [A] 2,3,5,6,9,10,13,17-21,26-28;
 [YA]WO9429436  (US NAVY [US], et al) [Y] 1 * page 11, line 31 - page 12, line 10 * * page 24, line 32 - page 27, line 1 * [A] 4-10,17;
 [DA]WO9506723  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-5,9,10,15-17,19,22,28,29 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9708186  (INVITROGEN CORP [US]) [A] 1-10,19,22-24 * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 16 * * page 10, line 1 - page 18, line 6 * * page 24, line 9 - page 25, line 16 *;
 [A]WO9209631  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1,4,5,9,10,22 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0455460  (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [A] 1,4-6,9,10,19,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0386766  (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 19,26,27 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH01203975
 [A]  - MEDIN J A ET AL, "Viral vectors for gene therapy of hematopoietic cells", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, AMSTERDAM NL, (199703), vol. 3, page 3-19, XP004075435 [A] 1,4,5,18,19,22,23 * page 7, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 8, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1380-2933(96)00059-0
 [A]  - MORELLE C, "RECOMBINAISON HOMOLOGUE ET CIBLAGE GENIQUE", BIOFUTUR., PARIS FR, (19940501), no. 134, pages 1, 3 - 12, XP000449127 [A] 19-29 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 39, Database accession no. 89-280998, XP002096031 & JPH01203975 A 19890816 (KONICA CORP) [A] 10,11 * abstract *
OppositionUS5464764
 WO9106667
 WO9309222
    - MANSOUR S L ET AL., "Disruption of the protooncogene int-2 in mouse embryo-derived stem cells: a general strategy for targeting mutations to non-selectable genes", NATURE, SALT LAKE CITY, (1988), vol. 336, pages 348 - 352,
    - HALLMANN A AND SUMPER M, "The Chlorella hexose/H+ symporter is a useful selectable marker and biochemical reagent when expressed in Volvox", PROC. NATL. ACAD.SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 669 - 673,
    - LE MOUELLIC H ET AL., "Homeosis in the Mouse Induced by a Null Mutation in the Hox-3.1 Gene", CELL, (1992), vol. 6, pages 251 - 264,
    - YAGI T ET AL., "Homologous recombination at c-fyn locus of mouse embryonic stem cells with use of diphteria toxin A-fragment gene in negative selection", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 9918 - 9922,