blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1036439

EP1036439 - EXCHANGE OF COMMUNICATION TRAFFIC IN A SATELLITE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Stationsplein 7
9726 AE Groningen / NL
[2000/38]
Inventor(s)01 / KAZEM, Mohammed, Ismael
G. Deynootweg 960
NL-2586 BW Den Haag / NL
02 / MULDER, Willem, Stado
Schuitwater 11
NL-2715 BL Zoetermeer / NL
03 / BRILL, Tiemen, Lukas
Beeklaan 486
NL-2562 BM Den Haag / NL
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Wuyts, Koenraad Maria, et al
Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Intellectual Property Group
P.O. Box 25110
3001 HC Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/28]Wuyts, Koenraad Maria, et al
Koninklijke KPN N.V., Intellectual Property Group, P.O. BOX 95321
2509 CH The Hague / NL
Former [2000/38]Klein, Bart, et al
Koninklijke KPN N.V., P.O. Box 95321
2509 CH The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date98955569.306.11.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998EP07212
Priority number, dateNL1997100771705.12.1997         Original published format: NL 1007717
US19970067668P05.12.1997         Original published format: US 67668 P
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9930436
Date:17.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036439
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036439
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.06.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04B7/185
[2000/38]
CPC:
H04B7/18563 (EP); H04B7/185 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
TitleGerman:AUSWECHSELN VON KOMMUNIKATIONSVERKEHR IN EINEM SATELLITEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2000/38]
English:EXCHANGE OF COMMUNICATION TRAFFIC IN A SATELLITE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2000/38]
French:ECHANGE DE TRAFIC DE COMMUNICATION DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS PAR SATELLITE[2004/02]
Former [2000/38]ECHANGE DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS PAR SATELLITE
Entry into regional phase05.07.2000National basic fee paid 
05.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
26.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2004Fee for grant paid
15.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
ES16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
IT16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
LU06.11.2004
IE08.11.2004
PT16.11.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
ES16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
LU06.11.2004
IE08.11.2004
Former [2006/13]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
IE08.11.2004
Former [2005/22]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/14]AT16.06.2004
BE16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/11]AT16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI16.06.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE16.09.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2295296  (INT MARITIME SATELLITE ORGANIZ [GB], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 23, line 8 - page 32, line 5 *;
 [A]DE19526415  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6* claims 1-18 *;
 [A]EP0808036  (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 6, line 32 - line 56 *;
 [A]WO9746036  (COMSAT CORP [US]) [A] 1,6 * claims 1-9 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.