Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036455

EP1036455 - COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.10.2003  [2003/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BEDDUS, Simon, Alexander
35 Grove Lane
Ipswich Suffolk IP4 1NX / GB
02 / BRUCE, Gary, Leslie
34 Haughgate Close
Woodbridge Suffolk IP12 1LQ / GB
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Robinson, Simon Benjamin , et al
BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department, PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Robinson, Simon Benjamin , et al
BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department 8th Floor, Holborn Centre 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2TE / GB
Former [2000/38]Wells, David , et al
BT Group Legal Services Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2TE / GB
Application number, filing date98955766.524.11.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998GB03503
Priority number, dateEP1997030981004.12.1997         Original published format: EP 97309810
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9929081
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036455
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04Q3/00
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/38]
TitleGerman:TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ[2000/38]
English:COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK[2000/38]
French:RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2000National basic fee paid 
19.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
17.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/44]
02.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4611094  (ASMUTH RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,12 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 51 * * column 4, line 10 - line 48 * * column 5, line 17 - line 54 * * column 6, line 19 - line 39 * * column 11, line 53 - column 13, line 15 * * column 17, line 53 - column 18, line 28 * * column 30, line 28 - line 47 * [Y] 4-6;
 [Y]US5206899  (GUPTA ALOK K [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * abstract * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 49 *;
 [Y]WO9534175  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract * * page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 19 * * figure 4 *