Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970160

EP0970160 - LUMINESCENT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - applicantpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
Former [2003/20]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
Former [2002/41]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
20099 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / JÜSTEL, Thomas
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / NIKOL, Hans
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / RONDA, Cornelis, Reinder
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
04 / DE HAIR, Johannes, Theodorus, Wilhelmus
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/07]
Former [2000/02]01 / JUSTEL, Thomas
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / NIKOL, Hans
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / RONDA, Cornelis, Reinder
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
04 / DE HAIR, Johannes, Theodorus, Wilhelmus
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Representative(s)Bosma, Rudolphus Hubertus Antonius
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Bosma, Rudolphus Hubertus Antonius
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date98955829.103.12.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998IB01934
Priority number, dateEP1997020403119.12.1997         Original published format: EP 97204031
EP1998020206322.06.1998         Original published format: EP 98202063
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932575
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970160
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09K11/66
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:LUMINESZENTES MATERIAL[2000/02]
English:LUMINESCENT MATERIAL[2000/02]
French:MATERIAU LUMINESCENT[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase20.09.1999National basic fee paid 
20.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/10]
08.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/01]
06.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US4703224  (RATTRAY KENDRICK D [US], et al)