Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035156

EP1035156 - PROCESSES FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PREPREGS AND LAMINATED SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.03.2005  [2005/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD.
5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD.
5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TOMINAGA, Yasushi
625-59, Hirashima Fujieda-shi
Shizuoka 426-0011 / JP
02 / NAKATA, Takahiro
7-18, Honmachi 1-chome Fujieda-shi
Shizuoka 426-0018 / JP
03 / KOSAKA, Wataru
12-1, Minamisurugadai 3-chome Fujieda-shi
Shizuoka 426-0078 / JP
04 / NAJIMA, Kazuyuki
5-1, Surugadai 5-chome Fujieda-shi
Shizuoka 426-0077 / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Vossius, Volker , et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Vossius, Volker, Dr. , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98955915.825.11.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998JP05294
Priority number, dateJP1997032472526.11.1997         Original published format: JP 32472597
JP1997035837125.12.1997         Original published format: JP 35837197
JP1997035837225.12.1997         Original published format: JP 35837297
JP1997035876926.12.1997         Original published format: JP 35876997
[2000/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927002
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035156
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08J5/24, B32B15/08, B29B13/10, B29B15/10, B29B15/12, B29B11/16, C08J3/20, B32B5/16, C08F8/00
[2001/05]
Former International [2000/37]C08J5/24, B32B15/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PREPREGS UND VERBUNDFOLIEN[2000/37]
English:PROCESSES FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PREPREGS AND LAMINATED SHEETS[2000/37]
French:PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION DE PREIMPREGNES ET DE STRATIFIES EN PLANCHE[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2000Translation filed 
18.04.2000National basic fee paid 
18.04.2000Search fee paid 
18.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
18.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
27.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/11]
12.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9516814  (ELECTROSTATIC TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * pages 1-3 * * page 6, line 14 - page 9, line 19 *;
 [Y]US4496415  (SPRENGLING GERHARD R [US]) [Y] 1-13 * column 2, line 4; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4104340  (WARD GENE R) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]GB947764  (POLYMER CORP) [Y] 1-13 * page 1; example 5 *;
 [Y]US4882102  (KAWAKUBO TAKAMASA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * example 1 *;
 [Y]US4022749  (KUECHLER WILLIAM L) [Y] 1-13 * columns 3-6 *;
 [A]US4657400  (SUEHISA SHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 7, lines 4-23 *
International search[X]JPS50143870  ;
 [X]JPS51138766  (JAPAN VILENE CO LTD);
 [X]JPS6134366B  ;
 [X]JPS51111879  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO);
 [X]JPS5918214B  ;
 [Y]JPH04263933  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO)