Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035123

EP1035123 - NOVEL HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED
2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-8510 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/34]For all designated states
Sumitomo Pharmaceuticals Company, Limited
2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-8510 / JP
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
Sumitomo Pharmaceuticals Company, Limited
2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-8510 / JP
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Sumitomo Pharmaceuticals Company, Limited
2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-8510 / JP
For all designated states
JAPAN ENERGY CORPORATION
10-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KURIMOTO, Ayumu
4-15-313, Maruhashi-cho
Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0831 / JP
02 / OGINO, Tetsuhiro
4-15-210, Maruhashi-cho
Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0831 / JP
03 / KAWAKAMI, Hajime
16-11, Jyurinjiminamimachi
Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0002 / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2000/37]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98955935.626.11.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998JP05318
Priority number, dateJP1997034742228.11.1997         Original published format: JP 34742297
JP1997036745111.12.1997         Original published format: JP 36745197
JP1997036744917.12.1997         Original published format: JP 36744997
[2000/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928321
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035123
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035123
Date:20.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07D473/16, C07D473/18, C07D473/24, A61K31/52, A61K31/535
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:NEUE HETEROZYKLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN[2000/37]
English:NOVEL HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS[2000/37]
French:NOUVEAUX COMPOSES HETEROCYCLIQUES[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase14.06.2000Translation filed 
14.06.2000National basic fee paid 
14.06.2000Search fee paid 
14.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
14.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
24.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2003Fee for grant paid
08.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
CY26.11.2003
LU26.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
[2005/02]
Former [2004/39]FI20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
CY26.11.2003
LU26.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/36]FI20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
CY26.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/31]FI20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/29]FI20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
Former [2004/16]FI20.08.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
Former [2004/14]FI20.08.2003
GR20.11.2003
Former [2004/12]FI20.08.2003
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPH08165292  (TECHNO RES KK, et al);
 [A]JPS61277686  (WELLCOME FOUND)
 [A]  - GOOD S S, ET AL., "DISPOSITION IN THE DOG AND THE RAT OF 2,6-DIAMINO-9- (2-HYDROXYETHOXYMETHYL)PURINE (A134U), A POTENTIAL PRODRUG OF ACYCLOVIR", Journal of Pharmacology and Experimental Therapeutics, American Society for Pharmacology and Experimental Therapeutics, US, US, (19830101), vol. 227, no. 03, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 644 - 651, XP002918391