Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0965990

EP0965990 - DIGITAL DATA REPRODUCING APPARATUS AND REPRODUCTION SIGNAL BINARIZATION LEVEL CORRECTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2011
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2011  [2011/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1999/51]For all designated states
Matsushita Electronics Corporation
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOBAYASHI, Motoyuki
5-1, Ayameikekita 3-chome
Nara-shi, Nara 631-0032 / JP
02 / HORIBE, Ryusuke
1-9-3-204, Nasudukuri
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP
03 / MATSUMOTO, Yasuki
12-1-912, Yamamotominami 3-chome
Takaraduka-shi, Hyogo 665-0882 / JP
04 / EDAHIRO, Yasuaki
305-3, Minamieganosho 5-chome
Habikino-shi, Osaka 583-0885 / JP
[1999/51]
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/51]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date98955973.727.11.1998
[1999/51]
WO1998JP05359
Priority number, dateJP1997032778328.11.1997         Original published format: JP 32778397
JP1998031000130.10.1998         Original published format: JP 31000198
[1999/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928908
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0965990
Date:22.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[1999/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11B20/10, G11B20/14
[2000/02]
Former International [1999/51]G11B20/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/51]
TitleGerman:WIDERGABEGERÄT FÜR DIGITALE DATEN UND BINARISIERUNGSPEGELKORREKTURVERFAHREN FÜR WIEDERGABESIGNALE[1999/51]
English:DIGITAL DATA REPRODUCING APPARATUS AND REPRODUCTION SIGNAL BINARIZATION LEVEL CORRECTING METHOD[1999/51]
French:APPAREIL DE REPRODUCTION DE DONNEES ET TECHNIQUE DE CORRECTION DE NIVEAU DE BINARISATION DE SIGNAL DE REPRODUCTION[1999/51]
Entry into regional phase04.05.1999Translation filed 
05.05.1999National basic fee paid 
05.05.1999Search fee paid 
05.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.1999Examination requested  [1999/51]
25.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/14]
17.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2011/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
17.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
09.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
24.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201013   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5359585  (TANOUE KOKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 41 - line 63 * * column 3, line 10 - line 16 * * column 4, line 46 - line 68 * * column 5, line 47 - line 55 * * figure 1 *;
 [DY]JPH0887756  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DY] 1;
 [DY]US5663942  (ISHIBASHI HIROMICHI [JP], et al) [DY] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US4005477  (OTTESEN HJALMAR HOLMBOE) [A] 4,5 * figures 1,3 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 27 * * column 4, line 2 - line 6 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 3 *;
 [A]JPH0817139  ;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PRESS W H ET AL, Numerical recipes: the art of scientific computing, CAMBRIDGE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1988), XP002122410 [A] * page 274 - page 334 *
International search[A]JPH05266485  ;
 [A]JPH0973726  (SONY CORP)