Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032957

EP1032957 - MICROSTRIP ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  09.06.2006
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.06.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 12.07.2006  [2006/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/18]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / BERGSTEDT, Leif
Allmänna vägen 6
S-518 40 Sjömarken / SE
02 / GEORGIAN, Spartak
Adler Salvius gata 15
S-411 11 Göteborg / SE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Bergquist, Kjell Gunnar
Zacco Sweden AB
Torggatan 8
Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Bergquist, Kjell Gunnar
Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB, P.O. Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date98956084.219.11.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998SE02092
Priority number, dateSE1997000429621.11.1997         Original published format: SE 9704296
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9927606
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1032957
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01P3/08, H01Q13/20
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/36]
TitleGerman:MIKROSTRIEFNENAORDNUNG[2000/36]
English:MICROSTRIP ARRANGEMENT[2000/36]
French:DISPOSITION DE MICRORUBANS[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2000National basic fee paid 
13.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
15.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
04.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/28]
06.02.2006Date of oral proceedings
17.02.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0801433  (HARRIS CORP [US]);
 [Y]US4521755  (CARLSON ERIC R [US], et al);
 [A]US5164692  (GERTEL EITAN [US], et al);
 [A]US4614922  (BAUMAN RALPH E [US], et al);
 [A]US4633262  (TRAUT G ROBERT [US]);
 [A]US4394630  (KENYON S WAYNE, et al)