Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1025178

EP1025178 - HOT MELT PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE WHICH EXHIBITS MINIMAL STAINING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
H.B. FULLER LICENSING & FINANCING, INC.
1200 Willow Lake Boulevard
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55110-5101 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
H.B. Fuller Licensing & Financing, Inc.
1200 Willow Lake Boulevard
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55110-5101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OELTJEN, Susan, T.
1200 Willow Lake Boulevard
St. Paul, MN 55110-5101 / US
02 / LINDQUIST, Jeffrey, S.
1200 Willow Lake Boulevard
St. Paul, MN 55110-5101 / US
03 / KODAMA, Yoshihiro
700 Matsushimacho Hamamatsu City
Shizuoka 430 / JP
04 / ASAI, Daisuke
700 Matsushimacho Hamamatsu City
Shizuoka 430 / JP
[2000/32]
Representative(s)Maiwald, Walter , et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date98956149.322.10.1998
[2000/32]
WO1998US22396
Priority number, dateUS19970063021P23.10.1997         Original published format: US 63021 P
US1997095729024.10.1997         Original published format: US 957290
[2000/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9920708
Date:29.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1025178
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1025178
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09J153/02, C09J153/00
[2000/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/32]
TitleGerman:SCHMELZHAFTKLEBER MIT EINER MINIMALEN VERSCHMUTZUNG[2000/32]
English:HOT MELT PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE WHICH EXHIBITS MINIMAL STAINING[2000/32]
French:ADHESIF AUTOCOLLANT THERMOFUSIBLE LAISSANT UN MINIMUM DE TACHES[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2000National basic fee paid 
18.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
02.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2002Fee for grant paid
29.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[PXY]WO9800471  (FULLER H B LICENSING FINANC [US]) [PX] 1-3,5,7-9 * page 3, line 1-21 ; page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 5 ; page 4, line 8 - page 7, line 8 ; Table 3 *; page 1, lines 31-32; claims 1-22 * [Y] 4,6,10-15;
 [X]WO9730844  (ATO FINDLEY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 4, line 23 - page 6, line 7; claims 2-9 *;
 [X]EP0238135  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * page 2, line 21-22 ; page 4, line 40-49 ; page 3, line 1-10 ; Tables 6,8 *; page 3, line 43 - page 4, line 28 *;
 [X]GB2115823  (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [X] 1,2,6-15 * page 1, line 26-63 ; page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 10 ; page 1, line 54-55 ; page 3, line 40-46 *; page 4, lines 1-20; table 1 *;
 [Y]EP0358907  (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]) [Y] 4 * abstract *;
 [Y]US5547766  (GOBRAN RAMSIS [US]) [Y] 6,10-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9510576  (FULLER H B LICENSING FINANC [US]) [Y] 1-3,8 * page 6, line 4 - page 9, line 15 *;
 [Y]WO9631573  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,8 * page 2, line 33 - page 4, line 12 *; page 7, lines 19-30; tables 1,2 *