Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034635

EP1034635 - WATERMARKING OF DIGITAL IMAGE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.07.2000
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2006Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawnpublished on 01.03.2006  [2006/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York
Broadway and West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027-6699 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York
Broadway and West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027-6699 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHANG, Shih-Fu, Columbia University
Dept. of Electrical Engineering
S.W. Mudd Building, Room 1312 / US
02 / MENG, Jianhao
435 West 119th Street 9L
New York, NY 10027 / US
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Howe, Steven , et al
Marks & Clerk
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Howe, Steven , et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date98956257.427.10.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998US22790
Priority number, dateUS19970063509P27.10.1997         Original published format: US 63509 P
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922480
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034635
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999
[2000/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04K1/00, H04L9/00, G09C5/00
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:WASSERZEICHEN VON DIGITALEN BILDDATEN[2000/37]
English:WATERMARKING OF DIGITAL IMAGE DATA[2000/37]
French:FORMATION DE FILIGRANE DANS DES DONNEES D'IMAGES NUMERIQUES[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2000National basic fee paid 
17.05.2000Search fee paid 
17.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/09]
27.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
03.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/48]
13.06.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200407   M06   Not yet paid
31.10.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5530759  (BRAUDAWAY GORDON W [US], et al);
 [A]US5664018  (LEIGHTON FRANK THOMSON [US]);
 [A]US5488664  (SHAMIR ADI [IL]);
 [X]  - COXT I J, ET AL., "SECURE SPREAD SPECTRUM WATERMARKING FOR MULTIMEDIA", TECHNICAL REPORT NEC RESEARCH INSTITUTE, XX, XX, XX, (19950101), pages 01 - 31, XP002916729