Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1094947

EP1094947 - PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZIH Corporation
1201 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
[2001/18]
Inventor(s)01 / JAEGER, Ralf, H.
21338 Highland
Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US
02 / SHEA, Maureen
2311 Lake Avenue
Wilmette, IL 60091 / US
03 / ULLENIUS, Kenneth, Folke
1200 Shagbark Lane
Union Grove, WI 53182 / US
04 / BIDINGER, Barry, M.
375 Brentwood Drive
Palatine, IL 60074 / US
05 / BOCHONOK, Steve, T.
726 Thomas Court
Libertyville, IL 60048-1856 / US
06 / EHRHARDT, Robert, A.
706 W. Hellen Road
Palatine, IL 60067-6057 / US
07 / SALMONS, Victor, L.
1570 Belle Plaine
Gurnee, Il 60031 / US
08 / TORCHALSKI, Karl
2504 North Forrest Lane
Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US
09 / WEST, David, A.
283 Whitewood Drive
Streamwood, IL 60107 / US
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Long, Edward Anthony
Hulse & Co
St. James House
2nd Floor
Vicar Lane
Sheffield S1 2EX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Long, Edward Anthony
Hulse & Co, St. James House, 8th Floor, Vicar Lane
Sheffield S1 2EX / GB
Application number, filing date98956346.530.10.1998
[2001/18]
WO1998US23010
Priority number, dateUS19970063787P31.10.1997         Original published format: US 63787 P
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9925554
Date:27.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1094947
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999
[2001/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:B41F1/00
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:DRUCKER[2001/18]
English:PRINTER[2001/18]
French:IMPRIMANTE[2001/18]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2000National basic fee paid 
16.03.2000Search fee paid 
16.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.03.2000Examination requested  [2001/18]
02.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/20]
11.12.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200508   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2005
31.10.200609   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5123606  (BRAUN MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,10-12 * column W * [Y] 3-9;
 [Y]US4492346  (YOUNG LAWRENCE C [US]) [Y] 3-9 * column W *;
 [A]US4142690  (KARLE HERBERT, et al) [A] 3 * column W *;
 [A]US4469288  (PONTES VIRGIL M [US]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US5314135  (FORREST JR ALBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US5211349  (SINAR MICHAEL M [US]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US4936522  (LEDUC ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]FR2583398  (ACHARD PICARD JEAN [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[X]DE2137754  (JUENGEL KG KARL);
 [A]US2345246  (ELKA PAUL P);
 [A]US1466121  (DALLAS CHARLES D);
 [X]US5229925  (SPENCER JOHN D [US], et al);
 [Y]US4471898  (PARKER OSCAR E [US]);
 [YP]US5699235  (TSURUMIYA OSAMU [JP], et al)