Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1027159

EP1027159 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING ARRAYS OF SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/33]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING ARRAYS
[2001/21]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PE Corporation (NY)
850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City
California 94404 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
PE Corporation (NY)
850 Lincoln Centre Drive
Foster City California 94404 / US
Former [2000/33]For all designated states
THE PERKIN-ELMER CORPORATION
850 Lincoln Centre Drive
Foster City California 94404 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KOWALLIS, Reid, B.
2875 Canyon Road
Burlingame, CA 94010 / US
02 / RAYSBERG, Yefim, M.
1157 Vuelta Olivos
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Vossius, Volker , et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Vossius, Volker, Dr. , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98956385.330.10.1998
[2000/33]
WO1998US23092
Priority number, dateUS19970065262P31.10.1997         Original published format: US 65262 P
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922867
Date:14.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1027159
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1027159
Date:03.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/14]
Search report(s)International search reportEP14.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/02
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/33]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MATRIXEN VON PROBEN[2000/33]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING ARRAYS OF SAMPLES[2001/21]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LA REALISATION DE MATRICES DE TITRAGE[2000/33]
Former [2000/33]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING ARRAYS
Entry into regional phase23.05.2000National basic fee paid 
23.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
23.05.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
30.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.08.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
06.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2001Fee for grant paid
21.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.04.2002
BE03.04.2002
FI03.04.2002
GR03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
IE30.10.2002
LU30.10.2002
CY31.10.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2004/39]AT03.04.2002
BE03.04.2002
GR03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
IE30.10.2002
LU30.10.2002
CY31.10.2002
Former [2004/10]AT03.04.2002
BE03.04.2002
GR03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
IE30.10.2002
CY31.10.2002
Former [2004/04]AT03.04.2002
BE03.04.2002
GR03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
IE30.10.2002
Former [2004/02]AT03.04.2002
BE03.04.2002
GR03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
IE30.10.2002
Former [2003/48]AT03.04.2002
BE03.04.2002
GR03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
Former [2003/46]AT03.04.2002
GR03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
Former [2003/21]AT03.04.2002
GR03.04.2002
PT03.07.2002
Former [2003/19]AT03.04.2002
GR03.04.2002
Former [2003/10]AT03.04.2002
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO8910192  (DAROUGAR SOHRAB [GB]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 5; figures 7,8 * * page 10, line 6 - page 11, line 18; figures 3,3A * * page 15, line 10 - line 24 * [Y] 5,6,11,12;
 [Y]DE19628178  (BRUKER FRANZEN ANALYTIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5,11 * page 5, line 41 - line 62; figure - *;
 [PA]WO9744134  (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [PA] 1,6,7,12 * column A * * page 14, line 3 - line 25; figure 9 * * page 17, line 7 - line 32; claims 13,18,25,29 *;
 [A]WO9535505  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 1 * page 25, line 26 - page 26, line 34; figure - * * page 18, line 11 - line 28; figure - *
 [AY]  - LEMMO A V ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF AN INKJET CHEMICAL MICRODISPENSER FOR COMBINATORIAL LIBRARY SYNTHESIS", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (19970215), vol. 69, no. 4, pages 543 - 551, XP000681609 [A] 1,7 * abstract * [Y] 6,12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac960808v