Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8367139 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2013 | B2 | US2011293788 | 01.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3682902 | 04.01.2002 | US43585009 | 05.05.2009 | US65157803 | 29.08.2003 | US201113117942 | 27.05.2011 | US96422497 | 04.11.1997 | US41332599 | 06.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7972643 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2011 | B2 | US2009211570 | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3682902 | 04.01.2002 | US43585009 | 05.05.2009 | US65157803 | 29.08.2003 | US96422497 | 04.11.1997 | US41332599 | 06.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7531199 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2009 | B2 | US2004047963 | 11.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3682902 | 04.01.2002 | US65157803 | 29.08.2003 | US96422497 | 04.11.1997 | US41332599 | 06.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4399516B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2010 | B2 | JP2001521727 | 13.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US96422497 | 04.11.1997 | US9823218 | 03.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1296499 | Global Dossier | 24.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US96422497 | 04.11.1997 | US9823218 | 03.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1028632 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96422497 | 04.11.1997 | US9823218 | 03.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2306238 | 14.05.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96422497 | 04.11.1997 | US9823218 | 03.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6613373 | 02.09.2003 | B2 | US2002146497 | 10.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3682902 | 04.01.2002 | US96422497 | 04.11.1997 | US41332599 | 06.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6352733 | 05.03.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US96422497 | 04.11.1997 | US41332599 | 06.10.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9922606 | Global Dossier | 14.05.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96422497 | 04.11.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6013299 | 11.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US96422497 | 04.11.1997 |