Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1028632

EP1028632 - PROCESS FOR MAKING ENZYME-RESISTANT STARCH FOR REDUCED-CALORIE FLOUR REPLACER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2010Change - representativepublished on 25.08.2010  [2010/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NABISCO, INC.
7 Campus Drive
Parsippany, NJ 07054-0311 / US
[2000/34]
Inventor(s)01 / HAYNES, Lynn
44 Grove Avenue
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
02 / GIMMLER, Norbert
6326 High Point Circle
Portage, MI 49024-1802 / US
03 / LOCKE, John, P., III
35 Woodcliff Avenue
Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07675 / US
04 / KWEON, Mee-Ra
Apartment K-48 44 Center Grove Road
Randolph, NJ 07869 / US
05 / SLADE, Louise
4D Yacenda Drive
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
06 / LEVINE, Harry
4D Yacenda Drive
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2000/43]
Former [2000/34]01 / HAYNES, Lynn
44 Grove Avenue
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
02 / GIMMLER, Norbert
10 Walker Drive
Ringwood, NJ 07456 / US
03 / LOCKE, John, P., III
35 Woodcliff Avenue
Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07675 / US
04 / KWEON, Mee-Ra
Apartment K-48 44 Center Grove Road
Randolph, NJ 07869 / US
05 / SLADE, Louise
4D Yacenda Drive
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
06 / LEVINE, Harry
4D Yacenda Drive
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
Representative(s)Wilson Gunn
Blackfriars House The Parsonage
5th Floor
Manchester M3 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/34]Wilson Gunn
5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester
M3 2JA / GB
Former [2000/34]Quest, Barry , et al
Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street
Manchester M2 7BD / GB
Application number, filing date98956440.603.11.1998
[2000/34]
WO1998US23218
Priority number, dateUS1997096422404.11.1997         Original published format: US 964224
[2000/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922606
Date:14.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1028632
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999
[2000/34]
Search report(s)International search reportUS14.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/05, A23L1/10, A23G3/00, A21D2/00, A21D10/00
[2000/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/34]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ENZYMRESISTENTER STAERKE FUER KALORIENREDUZIERTEN MEHLERSATZ[2000/34]
English:PROCESS FOR MAKING ENZYME-RESISTANT STARCH FOR REDUCED-CALORIE FLOUR REPLACER[2000/34]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'AMIDON RESISTANT AUX ENZYMES POUR UN PRODUIT DE SUBSTITUTION A LA FARINE A TENEUR REDUITE EN CALORIES[2000/34]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2000National basic fee paid 
28.04.2000Search fee paid 
28.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
03.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
17.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9015147  (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]);
 [Y]US5281276  (CHIU CHUNG-WAI [US], et al);
 [Y]US5387426  (HARRIS DONALD W [US], et al)