Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1028629

EP1028629 - ENHANCED INFANT FORMULA CONTAINING LIPOSOME ENCAPSULATED NUTRIENTS AND AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biozone Laboratories, Inc.
580 Garcia Avenue
Pittsburg, CA 94565 / US
[2000/34]
Inventor(s)01 / KELLER, Brian, C.
2507 Brocket Court
Antioch, CA 94509 / US
02 / Schwartz, Arnold William
P.O. Box 1324
Ross, California 84957 / US
 [2002/41]
Former [2000/34]01 / KELLER, Brian, C.
2507 Brocket Court
Antioch, CA 94509 / US
Representative(s)Sexton, Jane Helen
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]Sexton, Jane Helen
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98956585.805.11.1998
[2000/34]
WO1998US23532
Priority number, dateUS19970064518P05.11.1997         Original published format: US 64518 P
[2000/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922601
Date:14.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1028629
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999
[2000/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.05.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A23C9/15, A23C9/158, A23C21/06, A23P1/04, A23L1/29, A61K9/127
[2003/23]
Former International [2000/34]A23C9/15, A23C9/158, A23C21/06, A23P1/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/34]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES NAEHRPRAEPARAT FUER SAEUGLINGE ENTHALTEND IN LIPOSOMEN EINGEKAPSELTE NAEHR- UND WIRKSTOFFE[2000/34]
English:ENHANCED INFANT FORMULA CONTAINING LIPOSOME ENCAPSULATED NUTRIENTS AND AGENTS[2000/34]
French:FORMULE AMELIOREE POUR ENFANTS CONTENANT DES NUTRIMENTS ET DES AGENTS ENCAPSULES DANS DES LIPOSOMES[2000/34]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2000National basic fee paid 
05.06.2000Search fee paid 
05.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
01.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
11.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO8701587  (BIOCOMPATIBLES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-13 * page 5A - page 7 * * page 10, line 7 - page 11, line 2 * * page 11, line 26 - page 13, line 25 * * page 15, lines 16-20; claims 1,2,11-17 *;
 [X]US5043329  (LICHTENBERGER LENARD M [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 6, lines 55-62 * * column 10, lines 24-26 * * column 13, line 67 - column 14, line 12; claims 1,10-14 * * column 9, lines 55,56 *
International search[X]US5591446  (MELNIK BODO C [DE], et al);
 [XP]US5707670  (MEHANSHO HAILE [US], et al);
 [Y]US5013569  (RUBIN DAVID [US]);
 [Y]US4255454  (BRANNER-JORGENSEN SVEN);
 [Y]US4497836  (MARQUARDT ROBERT F [US], et al)