Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1028651

EP1028651 - FLUID AND ELECTROLYTE BALANCE MONITORING SYSTEM FOR SURGICAL AND CRITICALLY ILL PATIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.02.2003  [2003/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AQUINTEL, INC.
Suite 110, 2680 Bayshore Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
Aquintel, Inc.
Suite 110, 2680 Bayshore Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARIEFF, Allen, I.
299 South Street
Sausalito, CA 94965 / US
02 / STERN, Roger, A.
10418 Palo Vista Road
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2000/34]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/26]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Former [2000/34]Orchard, Oliver John
JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn
London WC1V 7PZ / GB
Application number, filing date98956676.506.11.1998
[2000/34]
WO1998US23831
Priority number, dateUS1997096554906.11.1997         Original published format: US 965549
[2000/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9923938
Date:20.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1028651
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999
[2000/34]
Search report(s)International search reportUS20.05.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP10.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61M5/168
[2002/26]
Former International [2000/34]A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/34]
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR DAS FLÜSSIGKEUTS- UND ELEKTROLYTGLEICHGEWICHT BEI PATIENTEN IN LEBENSGEFAHR[2000/34]
English:FLUID AND ELECTROLYTE BALANCE MONITORING SYSTEM FOR SURGICAL AND CRITICALLY ILL PATIENTS[2000/34]
French:SYSTEMES DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'EQUILIBRE DES LIQUIDES ET DES ELECTROLYTES, DESTINE A DES OPERES ET A DES MALADES EN PHASE CRITIQUE[2000/34]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2000National basic fee paid 
12.05.2000Search fee paid 
12.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
26.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/06]
03.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US4464172  (LICHTENSTEIN ERIC S [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 7 * * column 21, line 10 - line 16 * * column 18, line 33 - column 19, line 3 *;
 [X]EP0575712  (UNIV MANITOBA [CA]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 44 - column 3, line 51 * * column 22, line 15 - line 26 *;
 [Y]US5492537  (VANCAILLIE THIERRY G [US]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 56 *;
 [Y]US4743352  (WATKINS-PITCHFORD JOHN M [US]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 46 *;
 [A]US5100554  (POLASCHEGG HANS-DIETRICH [DE]) [A] 13-16 * column 1, line 50 - line 51 * * column 2, line 43 - line 52 *;
 [E]WO9966833  (AQUINTEL INC [US]) [E] 1-19 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US4449538  (CORBITT JOHN [US], et al);
 [Y]US5112622  (KOPP KLAUS F [DE]);
 [Y]US4448207  (PARRISH JOHN H [US]);
 [A]US5522805  (VANCAILLIE THIERRY G [US], et al)
by applicantUS4448207
 US4658834
 US4449538
 US4531088
 US5331958
 US5285682
 US5236664