Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1024990

EP1024990 - ELECTRICALLY ASSISTED AUTOMOTIVE POWER STEERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2009Change - representativepublished on 21.10.2009  [2009/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1
88046 Friedrichshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft
88038 Friedrichshafen / DE
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft
88038 Friedrichshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BRENNER, Peter
Eichenstrasse 6
D-73563 Mögglingen / DE
02 / BUDAKER, Martin
Limesstrasse 7
D-73540 Heubach / DE
03 / NAGEL, Willi
Schubartstrasse 11
D-71691 Freiberg / DE
04 / LOREIT, Uwe
Theutbirgstrasse 4
D-35580 Wetzlar / DE
[2000/32]
Representative(s)Schultenkämper, Johannes , et al
ZF Lenksysteme GmbH
Richard-Bullinger-Strasse 77
73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/43]Schultenkämper, Johannes , et al
ZF Lenksysteme GmbH Richard-Bullinger-Strasse 77
73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE
Former [2003/48]Schultenkämper, Johannes , et al
ZF Lenksysteme GmbH Patentabteilung EP
73522 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE
Former [2000/32]Wiechmann, Manfred , et al
ZF Lenksysteme GmbH, Patentabteilung EP
73522 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE
Application number, filing date98956879.527.10.1998
[2000/32]
WO1998EP06813
Priority number, dateDE199714763829.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19747638
[2000/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9921747
Date:06.05.1999
Language:DE
[1999/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1024990
Date:09.08.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1024990
Date:07.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:B62D6/10, G01L3/10, B62D15/02, G01L5/22, G01L5/10, // B62D153:00
[2000/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/32]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCH UNTERSTÜTZTE HILFSKRAFTLENKUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[2000/32]
English:ELECTRICALLY ASSISTED AUTOMOTIVE POWER STEERING SYSTEM[2000/32]
French:SERVO-DIRECTION ASSISTEE ELECTRIQUEMENT POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase15.03.2000National basic fee paid 
15.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
15.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
19.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2003Fee for grant paid
18.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]DE3821083  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,9 * column 8, line 42 - column 10, line 49; figures 1-4 * * column 10, line 60 - column 11, line 33; figures 6-9 * * column 17, line 50 - column 21, line 32; figures 23-33 * * claims 1,3,4,6,19 *;
 [D]DE3844578
by applicantDE3844578
 DE3711854