Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036130

EP1036130 - METHOD OF PREPARING HIGH BRIGHTNESS, SHORTER PERSISTENCE ZINC ORTHOSILICATE PHOSPHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 south Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
[2008/47]
Former [2004/21]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 south Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 south Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Inventor(s)01 / RAVILISETTY, P., Rao
349 Plutarch Road
Highland, NY 12528 / US
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2000/38]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98957032.003.12.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998GB03617
Priority number, dateUS1997098512804.12.1997         Original published format: US 985128
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928409
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036130
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036130
Date:19.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09K11/59, C01B33/20
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZINKORTHOSILIKAT-PHOSPHORS MIT HOHER HELLIGKEIT UND KURZNACHLEUCHTE[2000/38]
English:METHOD OF PREPARING HIGH BRIGHTNESS, SHORTER PERSISTENCE ZINC ORTHOSILICATE PHOSPHOR[2000/38]
French:PROCEDE POUR PREPARER DU PHOSPHORE D'ORTHOSILICATE DE ZINC A FORTE BRILLANCE ET A PERSISTANCE REDUITE[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2000National basic fee paid 
13.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
17.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2004Fee for grant paid
19.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]RU2084488  ;
 [A]JPH01272689
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 11, Database accession no. 98-119058, XP002094423 & RU2084488 C 19970720 (MOSC MENDELEEV CHEM TECHN INST) [A] 1,4,11,12,15,23-27 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 49, Database accession no. 89-361801, XP002094424 & JPH01272689 A 19891031 (UBE IND LTD) [A] 1,4,11,12,15,23-27 * abstract *