Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037744

EP1037744 - PROTECTIVE FIBERBOARD TO PROTECT ELECTROSTATIC SENSITIVE DEVICES FROM STATIC ELECTRICITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 04.11.2009  [2009/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vermillion, Robert J.
4711 Morgan Territory Road, P.O. Box 648
Clayton, CA 94517 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Vermillion, Robert J.
4711 Morgan Territory Road, P.O. Box 648
Clayton, CA 94517 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Moore, Christopher Mark , et al
Avidity IP
Kestrel House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]Moore, Christopher Mark , et al
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2007/51]Moore, Christopher Mark , et al
HLBBshaw Limited 1 Hagley Road 10th Floor
Birmingham B16 8TG / GB
Former [2000/39]Hepworth, John Malcolm , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street
Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB
Application number, filing date98957064.308.12.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998IB02003
Priority number, dateUS1997098710108.12.1997         Original published format: US 987101
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9929503
Date:17.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037744
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999
[2000/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:B32B29/00, H05K9/00
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2000/39]
TitleGerman:SCHUTZFASERPLATTE ZUM SCHUTZ ELEKTROSTATISCH EMPFINDLINCHER GERÄTE VOR STATISCHER ELEKTRIZITÄT[2000/39]
English:PROTECTIVE FIBERBOARD TO PROTECT ELECTROSTATIC SENSITIVE DEVICES FROM STATIC ELECTRICITY[2000/39]
French:CARTON FORT POUR LA PROTECTION CONTRE L'ELECTRICITE STATIQUE DE DISPOSITIFS SENSIBLES A L'ELECTRICITE STATIQUE[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2000National basic fee paid 
07.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
13.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/51]
04.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/51]
Request for further processing for:19.06.2007Request for further processing filed
19.06.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.07.2007Decision despatched
05.05.2006Request for further processing filed
05.05.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.05.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4966280  (BRADFORD JUDSON A [US]) [X] 1-3,11,16 * claims 11,12,17 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, line 16 - column 4, line 25 * * column 5, line 50 - line 66 * * column 6, line 23 - line 32 * [A] 4-10,12-15,17,18;
 [XA]US4909901  (MCALLISTER RICHARD G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10,11,16 * claims 1,2 * * column 2, line 50 - line 59 * * column 3, line 29 - line 39 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 8 * [A] 4-9,12-15,17,18;
 [DA]US5637377  (VERMILLION BOB [US]) [DA] 1-18 * claims 1-6,26 * * column 4, line 33 - line 40 * * column 5, line 42 - line 58 * * column 6, line 37 - line 53 *