Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036331

EP1036331 - IMMUNOASSAY METHOD AND KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[N/P]
Former [2005/02]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast-Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast-natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Universiteit Maastricht
Universiteitssingel 50
6229 ER Maastricht / NL
For all designated states
Stichting Sanquin Bloedvoorziening
Plesmanlaan 125
1066 CX Amsterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HERMENS, Willem, Theodoor
Carolusweg 16
NL-6247 CV Gronsveld / NL
02 / ROBERS, Markus
Notenborg 58
NL-6228 CX Maastricht / NL
03 / HACK, Cornelis, Erik
Van Dijkstraat 21
NL-1111 ND Diemen / NL
04 / AARDEN, Lucien, Adrianus
Noordmeerweg 10
NL-1151 CV Broek in Waterland / NL
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98957231.825.11.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998NL00670
Priority number, dateEP1997020375801.12.1997         Original published format: EP 97203758
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928751
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036331
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036331
Date:12.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/552, G01N33/543, G01N33/557
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
TitleGerman:IMMUNOASSAY VERFAHREN UND TESTSATZ[2000/38]
English:IMMUNOASSAY METHOD AND KIT[2000/38]
French:METHODE ET KIT DE DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2000National basic fee paid 
03.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
06.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2004Fee for grant paid
08.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR12.01.2005
PT12.06.2005
[2008/23]
Former [2008/16]PT12.06.2005
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0546222  (BIOSTAR INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * claims 1,2,7-10,13,15,16 * * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 4 * [Y] 1-18;
 [XDY]US5418136  (MILLER B JOHN [US], et al) [XD] 1-18 * column 7, line 25 - line 43 * * column 8, line 1 - line 45 * * column 9, line 46 - line 52; figure 7 * * column 11, line 30 - line 36 * * column 31, line 34 - column 33, line 12 * [Y] 1-18;
 [AD]EP0368462  (TECHNICON INSTR [US]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0458231  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0393868  (GEN BIOMETRICS INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *