Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032322

EP1032322 - A DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AN ATMOSPHERE IN A REGION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/36]A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AN ATMOSPHERE IN A REGION, AND USE OF CARBON DIOXIDE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT
[2003/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cardia Innovation AB
Engelbrektsgatan 19
114 32 Stockholm / SE
[2000/36]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DER LINDEN, Jan
Lillskogsvägen 22
S-133 34 Saltsjöbaden / SE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Berglund, Stefan
Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB
P.O. Box 5366
102 49 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Berglund, Stefan
Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58
114 50 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98957289.620.11.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998SE02115
Priority number, dateSE1997000426120.11.1997         Original published format: SE 9704261
[2000/36]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9929249
Date:17.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032322
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032322
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE17.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B19/00, A61M35/00
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBAUEN EINER ATMOSPHÄRE IN EINER ZONE[2003/31]
English:A DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AN ATMOSPHERE IN A REGION[2003/31]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'UNE ATMOSPHERE DANS UNE ZONE[2003/31]
Former [2000/36]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBAUEN EINER ATMOSPHÄRE, UND DIE VERWENDUNG VON KOHLENDIOXYD ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEDIKAMENTES
Former [2000/36]A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AN ATMOSPHERE IN A REGION, AND USE OF CARBON DIOXIDE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT
Former [2000/36]PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'UNE ATMOSPHERE DANS UNE ZONE, ET UTILISATION DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN MEDICAMENT
Entry into regional phase20.11.1998Translation filed 
08.06.2000National basic fee paid 
08.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
08.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
22.12.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
19.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
15.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2003Fee for grant paid
20.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
ES03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
IT03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
PT03.08.2004
LU20.11.2004
IE22.11.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
ES03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
LU20.11.2004
IE22.11.2004
Former [2006/13]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
IE22.11.2004
Former [2005/18]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2005/05]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2005/01]AT03.03.2004
BE03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/44]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI03.03.2004
SE03.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9726034  (HEARTPORT INC [US]);
 [X]WO9639942  (HEARTPORT INC [US]);
 [X]FR2656218  (FRANCE PROD OXYGENES CO [FR]);
 [X]DE2646710  (NOURI ZIAD DIPL ING)