Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053217

EP1053217 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF N-PROPANOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Celanese International Corporation
1601 West LBJ Freeway
Dallas, TX 75234 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
Celanese International Corporation
1601 West LBJ Freeway
Dallas, Texas 75234 / US
Inventor(s)01 / UNRUH, Jerry, D.
622 Bradshaw
Corpus Christi, TX 78412 / US
02 / RYAN, Debra, A.
7710 Cisco Circle
Corpus Christi, TX 78413 / US
03 / DUGAN, Shannon, L.
818 Plantation Road
Maize, KS 67101 / US
 [2001/05]
Former [2000/47]01 / UNRUH, Jerry, D.
622 Bradshaw
Corpus Christi, TX 78412 / US
02 / RYAN, Debra, A.
7710 Cisco Circle
Corpus Christi, TX 78413 / US
03 / DUGAN, Shannon, L.
2302 Utah Place
Hutchinson, KS 67502 / US
Representative(s)James, Anthony Christopher W.P. , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/33]James, Anthony Christopher W.P. , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2000/47]De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98957540.203.11.1998
[2000/47]
WO1998US23389
Priority number, dateUS1997098914411.12.1997         Original published format: US 989144
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9929643
Date:17.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053217
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053217
Date:21.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/21]
Search report(s)International search reportEP17.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07C29/141, C07C29/80, C07C31/10
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N-PROPANOL[2000/47]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF N-PROPANOL[2000/47]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE N-PROPANOL[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2000National basic fee paid 
27.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
21.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2003Fee for grant paid
07.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DA]US4263449  (SAITO TOSHIHIRO, et al) [DA] 1-11;
 [A]GB1579159  (BASF AG) [A] 1-11;
 [A]EP0269888  (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * example 3 *