EP1045690 - BENZENESULFONAMIDE INHIBITORS OF PDE-IV AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warner-Lambert Company LLC 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Warner-Lambert Company LLC 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | ||
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONNOR, David, Thomas 2453 Antietam Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | 02 /
MENETSKI, Joseph, Peter 8989 E. Stoney Field Drive Dexter, MI 48130 / US | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Mansmann, Ivo, et al Warner-Lambert Company Patent Department, c/o Gödeke AG Mooswaldallee 1-9 79090 Freiburg / DE | [2009/31] |
Former [2000/43] | Mansmann, Ivo, et al Warner-Lambert Company, Legal Division, Patent Department, c/o Gödecke AG 79090 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98957571.7 | 04.11.1998 | [2000/43] | WO1998US23482 | Priority number, date | US19970066943 | 25.11.1997 Original published format: US 66943 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9926616 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045690 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1045690 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/18, A61P31/00, A61P11/00 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4453 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2000/43] | A61K31/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Extension states | AL | 26.06.2000 | LT | 26.06.2000 | LV | 26.06.2000 | MK | 26.06.2000 | RO | 26.06.2000 | SI | 26.06.2000 | Title | German: | PHENOLSULFONAMIDE ALS PDE-IV INHIBITOREN UND IHRE THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2000/43] | English: | BENZENESULFONAMIDE INHIBITORS OF PDE-IV AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USE | [2000/43] | French: | INHIBITEURS BENZENESULFAMIDES DE LA PHOSPHODIESTERASE IV ET UTILISATION THERAPEUTIQUE DE CES DERNIERS | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 10.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2007/18] |
Former [2005/02] | MC | 30.11.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9636596 (CHIROSCIENCE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-31 * claim - *; | [DA]WO9636595 (CHIROSCIENCE LTD [GB]) [DA] 1-31 * claim - *; | [DA]WO9636611 (CHIROSCIENCE LTD [GB]) [DA] 1-31 * claim - *; | [PA]WO9744322 (CHIROSCIENCE LTD [GB], et al) [PA] 1-31* claim - * |